Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0706951

EP0706951 - Closure with snap-type hinge cap [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OWENS-ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC.
One Seagate Toledo
Ohio 43666 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/16]For all designated states
OWENS-ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC.
One Seagate
Toledo Ohio 43666 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Fuchs, Timothy J.
641 Oak Knoll Drive
Perrysburg, Ohio 43551 / US
[1996/16]
Representative(s)Votier, Sidney David , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
[1996/16]
Application number, filing date95307170.111.10.1995
[1996/16]
Priority number, dateUS1994032263613.10.1994         Original published format: US 322636
[1996/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0706951
Date:17.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0706951
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:B65D47/08
[1996/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/16]
TitleGerman:Schnappscharnierverschluss[1996/16]
English:Closure with snap-type hinge cap[1996/16]
French:Capuchon à charnière avec effet de ressort[1996/16]
Examination procedure24.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/38]
29.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.1999Fee for grant paid
07.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
15.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE05.04.2000
AT11.10.2000
DK11.10.2000
IE11.10.2000
LU11.10.2000
PT11.10.2000
ES12.10.2000
BE31.10.2000
CH31.10.2000
GR31.10.2000
LI31.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
[2008/29]
Former [2004/39]SE05.04.2000
AT11.10.2000
DK11.10.2000
IE11.10.2000
LU11.10.2000
ES12.10.2000
BE31.10.2000
CH31.10.2000
GR31.10.2000
LI31.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2004/28]SE05.04.2000
AT11.10.2000
DK11.10.2000
IE11.10.2000
ES12.10.2000
BE31.10.2000
CH31.10.2000
GR31.10.2000
LI31.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2004/09]SE05.04.2000
AT11.10.2000
DK11.10.2000
IE11.10.2000
BE31.10.2000
CH31.10.2000
GR31.10.2000
LI31.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2003/45]SE05.04.2000
AT11.10.2000
DK11.10.2000
IE11.10.2000
BE31.10.2000
CH31.10.2000
LI31.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2002/42]SE05.04.2000
AT11.10.2000
IE11.10.2000
BE31.10.2000
CH31.10.2000
LI31.10.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2002/29]SE05.04.2000
AT11.10.2000
IE11.10.2000
BE31.10.2000
CH31.10.2000
LI31.10.2000
Former [2002/17]AT11.10.2000
IE11.10.2000
BE31.10.2000
CH31.10.2000
LI31.10.2000
Former [2002/15]AT11.10.2000
BE31.10.2000
CH31.10.2000
LI31.10.2000
Former [2002/13]BE31.10.2000
CH31.10.2000
LI31.10.2000
Former [2002/03]BE31.10.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0494306  (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6 * column 1, line 55 - column 22, line 31 * * column 4, line 14 - line 31; figures 4-11 *;
 [X]WO8404906  (ALFATECHNIC AG [CH]) [X] 1-3 * page 6, line 1 - page 9, line 12; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]EP0608755  (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 29; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE8536556U  (HAARKOSMETIK UND PARFUMERIE GMBH) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0129024  (ZELLER PLASTIK KOEHN GRAEBNER [DE])
by applicantUS3628215
 US3629901
 US3933271
 US4047495
 US4386714
 US4638916