Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0715116

EP0715116 - Liquid injection apparatus for use in a method of lining the internal surface of a pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.01.2001 [2001/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOKYO GAS CO., LTD.
5-20, Kaigan 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-0022 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
TOKYO GAS CO., LTD.
5-20, Kaigan 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-0022 / JP
Former [1996/23]For all designated states
TOKYO GAS CO., LTD.
5-20, Kaigan 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Toyoda, Shigeru
17-17 Negishi 1-chome
Urawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Yagi, Suichi, No. 503, 3rd Ekureru, Myorenji Bldg.
1-19 Higashiterao 1-chome, Tsurumi-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
03 / Itagaki, Masaaki
28-37 Sasage 5-chome, Konan-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1996/23]
Representative(s)Kirk, Geoffrey Thomas
BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/23]Kirk, Geoffrey Thomas
BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road
London EC1R 0DS / GB
Application number, filing date95308219.515.11.1995
[1996/23]
Priority number, dateJP1994029349428.11.1994         Original published format: JP 29349494
JP1994029349528.11.1994         Original published format: JP 29349594
[1996/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0715116
Date:05.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0715116
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:F16L55/162
[1996/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/23]
TitleGerman:Gerät zur Flüssigkeitseinspritzung bei einem Verfahren zur Innenbeschichtung eines Rohres[1996/23]
English:Liquid injection apparatus for use in a method of lining the internal surface of a pipe[1996/23]
French:Appareil d'injection d'un liquide pour une méthode de revêtement de la surface intérieure d'une conduite[1999/18]
Former [1996/23]Appareil d'injection d'un liquide pour une méthode de revêtement de la surface intérieure d'un tuyau
Examination procedure11.12.1995Examination requested  [1996/23]
11.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.1999Fee for grant paid
19.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0593264  (TOKYO GAS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 38 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 11 * * column 4, line 53 - line 56 * * column 5, line 6 - line 22 * * column 6, line 5 - line 21 * * column 6, line 47 - line 54 * * column 7, line 20 - line 47 * * claims 1-7 * * figures 1-5,7-9 *;
 [A]DE3447492  (TOKYO GAS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * claim 1 * * fig.1: reference numbers 7,7c,7b,10,10a *;
 [A]JPS58193776
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840208), vol. 008, no. 030, Database accession no. (C - 209), [A] 1 * abstract *