Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0716166

EP0716166 - Process for preparing single crystal material and composite material for forming such single crystal material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2000
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.02.2001 [2001/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INTERNATIONAL SUPERCONDUCTIVITY TECHNOLOGY CENTER
No. 34-3, Shinbashi 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1996/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Wang, Furen
3-28-10-101, Ikebukuro, Toshima-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Morishita, Tadataka
820, Yamanishi, Ninomiya-cho
Naka-gun, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1996/24]
Representative(s)Allam, Peter Clerk
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/24]Allam, Peter Clerk
LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date95308677.401.12.1995
[1996/24]
Priority number, dateJP1994030473508.12.1994         Original published format: JP 30473594
[1996/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0716166
Date:12.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0716166
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.1996
ClassificationInternational:C30B1/02, C30B29/32, H01L41/24
[1996/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/24]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von einkristallinem Material und Verbundmaterial für dieses Verfahren[1999/51]
English:Process for preparing single crystal material and composite material for forming such single crystal material[1996/24]
French:Procédé pour préparer un matériau monocristallin et matériau composite utilisé dans ce procédé[1996/24]
Former [1996/24]Verfahren zur Herstellung einkristallinem Material und Verbundmaterial für dieses Verfahren
Examination procedure04.10.1996Examination requested  [1996/49]
09.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.1999Fee for grant paid
30.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US4840816  (APPLETON BILL R [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,8 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0480789  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]);
 [A]US4046618  (CHAUDHARI PRAVEEN, et al)
 [X]  - LAU ET AL., "solar furnace annealing of amorphous Si layers", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, NEW YORK US, vol. 35, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1063/1.91109, pages 327 - 329, XP001008697 [X] 1,6 * page 327 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.91109
 [A]  - YOSHIMOTO ET AL., "two-dimensional epitaxial growth of ....", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, TOKYO JP, vol. 31, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1143/JJAP.31.3664, pages 3664 - 3666, XP000414734 [A] 1,6 * page 3664 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.31.3664