Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0718637

EP0718637 - Radar system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.04.2002
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.06.2002  [2002/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/26]For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, 2-chome Minami-Aoyama
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okada, Yasushi
c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd., 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Takebe, Katsuhiko
c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd., 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
03 / Andou, Hiroyuki
c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd., 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
[1996/26]
Representative(s)Tothill, John Paul , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]Tothill, John Paul , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [1996/38]Price, Anthony Stuart
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [1996/26]Price, Anthony Stuart
Frank B. Dehn & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UZ / GB
Application number, filing date95309257.419.12.1995
[1996/26]
Priority number, dateJP1994031682120.12.1994         Original published format: JP 31682194
[1996/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0718637
Date:26.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0718637
Date:18.03.1998
[1998/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0718637
Date:13.06.2001
Language:EN
[2001/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01S13/10, G01S13/36
[1996/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/26]
TitleGerman:Radarsystem[1996/26]
English:Radar system[1996/26]
French:Système radar[1996/26]
Examination procedure07.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/27]
06.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.04.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2001Fee for grant paid
01.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
24.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPS56133669  ;
 [A]JPS6039579  ;
 [A]US5118180  (WICHMANN GUENTER [DE], et al) [A] 4 * column 4, line 1 - line 58; figure 2 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820119), vol. 006, no. 008, Database accession no. (P - 098), [Y] 1 * abstract *
 [Y]  - O. K. NILSSEN ET AL., "Amplitude Modulated CW Radar", IRE TRANSACTIONS ON AEROSPACE AND NAVIGATIONAL ELECTRONICS, (196212), vol. ANE-9, no. 4, pages 251 - 254, XP002052931 [Y] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850709), vol. 009, no. 163, Database accession no. (P - 371), [A] 1 * abstract *