blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0674299


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.11.2000 No opposition filed within time limit published on  10.01.2001 [2001/02]
11.12.1999 (Expected) grant published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
05.11.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
27.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
28.01.1999 Renewal fee
05.01.1999 Examination report or reply
18.09.1998 First examination report
14.09.1998 Examination report or reply
22.01.1998 Renewal fee
14.01.1997 Renewal fee
11.08.1995 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  27.09.1995 [1995/39]
11.08.1995 Request for examination filed published on  27.09.1995 [1995/39]