blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0674299
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0674299Global Dossier 26.01.2000B1
EP0674299 27.09.1995A1
Priority number Date
FR9404118 24.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69514705D 02.03.2000D1
Priority number Date
FR9404118 24.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69514705T 17.08.2000T2
Priority number Date
FR9404118 24.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2717935 31.05.1996B1
FR2717935 29.09.1995A1
Priority number Date
FR9404118 24.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5515286 07.05.1996A
Priority number Date
FR9404118 24.03.1994