blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0674299

Designated contracting states DE 
 GB 
 IT 
Examination procedure15.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted26.01.2000
Opposition procedure27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit published on 10.01.2001 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:27.09.1995 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE GB IT
 
Event date:27.09.1995 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19950216
 
Event date:04.11.1998 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19980917
 
Event date:26.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE GB IT
 
Event date:02.03.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69514705
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000302
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20000317
 
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
Owner Name:STUDIO GLP S.R.L.
 
Event date:10.01.2001 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:10.02.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20050210
 
Event date:30.06.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20100202
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:26.10.2011 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20110210
 
Event date:29.02.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20110210
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20140417
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:11.02.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69514705 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT