Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0674299

EP0674299 - Method and device for the avoidance of collisions between aircraft and relief obstacles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SEXTANT Avionique
Immeuble le Galilée Parc Tertiaire de Meudon 5/7, rue Jeanne Braconnier
92366 Meudon la Forêt Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
SEXTANT AVIONIQUE
Immeuble le Galilée Parc Tertiaire de Meudon 5/7, rue Jeanne Braconnier
92366 Meudon la Forêt Cédex / FR
Former [1995/39]For all designated states
SEXTANT AVIONIQUE
Immeuble le Galilée Parc Tertiaire de Meudon 5/7, rue Jeanne Braconnier
F-92366 Meudon la Foret Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Simon, Georges-Henri
20, rue des Peupliers
F-91320 Wissous / FR
[1995/39]
Representative(s)de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie
Cabinet Moutard
35 Rue de la Paroisse
B.P. 20513
78005 Versailles Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1995/39]de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie
CABINET MOUTARD 35, Avenue Victor Hugo
F-78960 Voisins le Bretonneux / FR
Application number, filing date95400275.410.02.1995
[1995/39]
Priority number, dateFR1994000411824.03.1994         Original published format: FR 9404118
[1995/39]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0674299
Date:27.09.1995
Language:FR
[1995/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0674299
Date:26.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.1995
ClassificationInternational:G08G5/02, G05D1/06, G01C21/00
[1995/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [1995/39]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Kollisionsschutz zwischen Flugzeugen und Hindernissen des Reliefs[1995/39]
English:Method and device for the avoidance of collisions between aircraft and relief obstacles[1995/39]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour la prévention des collisions des aérodynes avec les obstacles du relief[1995/39]
Examination procedure16.02.1995Examination requested  [1995/39]
17.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.1999Fee for grant paid
15.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0565399  (DASSAULT ELECTRONIQUE) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5111400  (YODER) [Y] 1-10 * column W *;
 [A]WO8503566  (SUNSTRAND DATA CONTROL,INC.) [A] 1,2,5-9 * page 3, line 27 - page 7, line 12; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9221077  (GEC-MARCONI LIMITED) [A] 1,2,5-9 * abstract *