Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0670565

EP0670565 - Method and device for the selection of traffic information [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 19.02.2003  [2003/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RENAULT
34 Quai du Point du Jour
92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[1999/36]
Former [1995/36]For all designated states
REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT S.A.
34, Quai du Point du Jour
F-92109 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Delos, Michel
90, rue de Rosny
F-93100 Montreuil / FR
02 / Le Maire, Sylvie
15, rue Etienne Deforges
92320 Chatillon / FR
[1995/36]
Application number, filing date95400466.903.03.1995
[1995/36]
Priority number, dateFR1994000250004.03.1994         Original published format: FR 9402500
[1995/36]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0670565
Date:06.09.1995
Language:FR
[1995/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0670565
Date:05.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.1995
ClassificationInternational:G08G1/09
[1995/36]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   GB,   NL [1995/36]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Wahl von Verkehrsnachrichten[1995/36]
English:Method and device for the selection of traffic information[1995/36]
French:Procédé et dispositif de sélection d'informations routières[1995/36]
Examination procedure14.02.1996Examination requested  [1996/15]
23.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.1999Fee for grant paid
30.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
19.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL05.01.2000
BE31.03.2000
GB05.04.2000
[2003/08]
Former [2001/17]BE31.03.2000
GB05.04.2000
Former [2001/11]BE31.03.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0564353  (SAGEM [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, column 1, line 26 - column 2, line 35 * * page 3, column 3, line 41 - page 4, column 5, line 3 * * page 5, column 7, line 46 - column 8, line 50; figure . *;
 [A]FR2651352  (URBA 2000 [FR]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 27 - page 11, line 2 *;
 [A]EP0290679  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  DE GROOT, "RHINE-CORRIDOR AN RDS-TMC PILOT FOR RADIO TRAFFIC INFORMATION", VNIS '92;VEHICLE NAVIGATION & INFORMATION SYSTEMS, SEPTEMBER 2-4, 1992, IEEE US, page 8, [A] 1 * page 11, line 18 - line 43 *