Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0676194

EP0676194 - Cosmetic or dermatological compositions comprising an alpha-hydroxy acid, salicylic acid and a retinoid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  05.12.2014
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 25.04.2018  [2018/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beiersdorf AG
Unnastrasse 48
20245 Hamburg / DE
[2003/12]
Former [1997/23]For all designated states
The Boots Company PLC
1 Thane Road West
Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG2 3AA / GB
Former [1995/41]For all designated states
ROUSSEL UCLAF
102 Route de Noisy
F-93230 Romainville / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Bobier-Rival, Carinne
34, rue de l'Amiral
Port-Cergy
F-95000 Cergy / FR
02 / Fournier, Odile
2, Domaine de la Côte Noire
F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR
03 / Fructus, Alain
15, rue Carle Hébert
F-92400 Courbevoie / FR
 [2015/02]
Former [1995/41]01 / Bobier-Rival, Carinne
34, rue de l'Amiral, Port-Cergy
F-95000 Cergy / FR
02 / Fournier, Odile
2, Domaine de la Côte Noire
F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR
03 / Fructus, Alain
15, rue Carle Hébert
F-92400 Courbevoie / FR
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2003/12]
Former [1997/23]Thacker, Michael Anthony , et al
The Boots Company plc Group Patents Department, D31, 1 Thane Road West
Nottingham NG2 3AA / GB
Former [1995/41]Vieillefosse, Jean-Claude , et al
ROUSSEL UCLAF, Département des Brevets, 111, Route de Noisy
F-93235 Romainville Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date95400694.629.03.1995
[1995/41]
Priority number, dateFR1994000387301.04.1994         Original published format: FR 9403873
[1995/41]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0676194
Date:11.10.1995
Language:FR
[1995/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0676194
Date:23.04.1997
[1997/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0676194
Date:14.11.2001
Language:FR
[2001/46]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0676194
Date:07.01.2015
Language:FR
[2015/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/60
[2015/02]
Former International [2001/45]A61K7/48, A61K31/60
Former International [1997/14]A61K7/48, A61K31/61, A61K31/60
Former International [1995/41]A61K7/42, A61K31/61, A61K31/60
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/41]
TitleGerman:Kosmetische oder dermatologische Zusammensetzung, die ein alpha-Hydroxysäure, Salicylsäure und ein Retinoid enthalten[1995/41]
English:Cosmetic or dermatological compositions comprising an alpha-hydroxy acid, salicylic acid and a retinoid[1995/41]
French:Compositions cosmétiques ou dermatologiques contenant un alpha-hydroxyacide de l'acide salicylique et un retinoide[1995/41]
Examination procedure29.03.1997Examination requested  [1997/22]
22.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.02.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.2001Fee for grant paid
11.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.08.2002  30.08.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
VTP Patente
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Semrau, Markus, et al
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
VTP Patente
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/24]
Opponent(s)01  14.08.2002  30.08.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
VTP Patente
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Semrau, Markus, et al
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA VTP Patente
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2004/40]
Opponent(s)01  14.08.2002  30.08.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Semrau, Markus, et al
Henkel KGaA Patente (VTP) Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2002/41]
Opponent(s)01  14.08.2002  30.08.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Foitzik, Joachim Kurt, et al
Henkel KGaA Patente (VTP)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
19.09.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.04.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2005Reply to a communication from the opposition division
26.03.2007Date of oral proceedings
11.06.2007Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.06.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.07.2009Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.07.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
25.11.2014Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition13.08.2007Appeal received No.  T1395/07
22.10.2007Statement of grounds filed
07.07.2009Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
07.07.2009Date of oral proceedings
13.07.2009Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
11.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.11.2001
GR14.11.2001
IE14.11.2001
DK14.02.2002
PT14.02.2002
LU29.03.2002
[2016/35]
Former [2015/38]AT14.11.2001
GR14.11.2001
IE14.11.2001
DK14.02.2002
PT14.02.2002
LU29.03.2002
Former [2004/43]GR14.11.2001
IE14.11.2001
DK14.02.2002
PT14.02.2002
LU29.03.2002
Former [2004/39]GR14.11.2001
DK14.02.2002
PT14.02.2002
LU29.03.2002
Former [2003/45]GR14.11.2001
DK14.02.2002
PT14.02.2002
Former [2002/49]GR14.11.2001
PT14.02.2002
Former [2002/48]PT14.02.2002
Documents cited:Search[DY]US5153230  (M.H. JAFFERY) [DY] 1-10 * column W *;
 [Y]FR2310767  (DSO "PHARMACHIM") [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]GB2188233  (M.F. BELDA GALIANA) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - MICROMEDEX, INC., DENVER, COLORADO, VOL. 82, FILE MARTINDALE, THE EXTRA PHARMACOPOEIA., XP002024677 [Y] 1-10 * VERRA-MED *
 [Y]  - MICROMEDEX, INC., DENVER, COLORADO, VOL. 82, FILE MARTINDALE, THE EXTRA PHARMACOPOEIA., XP002024678 [Y] 1-10 * KYTTA-NAGELSALBE *
 [Y]  - MICROMEDEX, INC., DENVER, COLORADO, VOL. 82, FILE MARTINDALE, THE EXTRA PHARMACOPOEIA., XP002024679 [Y] 1-10 * APSOR *
 [Y]  - MICROMEDEX, INC., DENVER, COLORADO, VOL. 82, FILE MARTINDALE, THE EXTRA PHARMACOPOEIA., XP002024680 [Y] 1-10 * ACERBINE *
 [Y]  - MICROMEDEX, INC., DENVER, COLORADO, VOL. 82, FILE MARTINDALE, THE EXTRA PHARMACOPOEIA., XP002024681 [Y] 1-10 * ANTIVERRUGAS *
OppositionWO9504537
 US4216224
 EP0273202
 EP0508324
 WO9401083
 EP0610511
    - Schreiben des Patentanmelders "The Boots Company Nottingham" zur Darlegung des synergistichen Effektes des Patentgegenstandes vom 24.03.2000
    - E. MUTSCHLER ET AL., Arzneimittelwirkungen, STUTTGART, WISSENSCHAFTLICHE VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, (1986), vol. 5, pages 549 - 552
    - J. FALBE ET AL., Römpp Chemie Lexikon, STUTTGART - NEW YORK, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, (1992), vol. 9