Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0676194 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0676194



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 684
17.07.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
11.12.2014 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
11.12.2014 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
05.12.2014 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
25.11.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
25.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
25.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
22.08.2014 English translation of the claims Opposition 2
22.08.2014 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
22.08.2014 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
10.07.2014 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
10.07.2014 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
10.07.2014 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
14.04.2014 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
05.10.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.10.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
01.10.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
01.10.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.09.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 16
13.07.2009 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
12.05.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.05.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
21.04.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
11.04.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.04.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.04.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.04.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.04.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
30.03.2009 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
25.03.2009 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
04.06.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.05.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
31.10.2007 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.10.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
24.10.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
22.10.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
12.10.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
29.08.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
16.08.2007 English translation of the claims Opposition 2
16.08.2007 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
16.08.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.08.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
14.08.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
13.08.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
16.06.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.06.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.06.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.06.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.06.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
11.06.2007 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
11.06.2007 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.06.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
11.06.2007 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
11.06.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.06.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
11.06.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
11.06.2007 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
11.06.2007 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.06.2007 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.03.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.03.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.03.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.2007 Claims Opposition 2
26.02.2007 Claims Opposition 2
26.02.2007 Claims Opposition 2
26.02.2007 Claims Opposition 2
26.02.2007 Claims Opposition 2
26.02.2007 Claims Opposition 2
26.02.2007 Claims Opposition 2
26.02.2007 Claims Opposition 2
26.02.2007 Claims Opposition 2
26.02.2007 Claims Opposition 2
26.02.2007 Claims Opposition 3
26.02.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.01.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.01.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.01.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.01.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.01.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.01.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.01.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
05.01.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.01.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.11.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.10.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.10.2005 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 3
21.10.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.10.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.10.2005 Claims Opposition 2
20.10.2005 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.10.2005 Claims Opposition 2
19.10.2005 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.10.2005 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
19.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.09.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.09.2005 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
07.09.2005 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.09.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.08.2005 Claims Opposition 1
27.08.2005 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
12.05.2005 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
12.05.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
12.04.2005 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
15.02.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.01.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.01.2005 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
30.04.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.04.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.04.2003 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 17
24.02.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.02.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
15.02.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
13.02.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
31.01.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.01.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.01.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
31.01.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
20.01.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.01.2003 Request for transfer of rights Opposition 1
13.01.2003 Request for transfer of rights Opposition 1
20.12.2002 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.09.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
19.09.2002 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
30.08.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.08.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.08.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
16.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 36
16.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
16.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
16.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
16.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 7
16.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 28
16.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
16.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
16.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 26
16.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
16.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 40
16.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 16
16.08.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
14.08.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
23.07.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.10.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
11.05.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.05.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
11.05.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
21.02.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
17.02.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.02.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
31.10.2000 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
31.10.2000 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
28.09.2000 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
27.03.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.11.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.04.1997 Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant Search / examination 1
29.03.1997 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.03.1997 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
29.03.1997 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.03.1997 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
03.03.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.03.1997 European search report Search / examination 2
06.11.1996 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
29.10.1996 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
01.08.1995 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.06.1995 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
10.06.1995 Request for change of address of the applicant Search / examination 3
29.03.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.03.1995 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
29.03.1995 Claims Search / examination 2
29.03.1995 Description Search / examination 13
29.03.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.03.1995 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
29.03.1995 Priority document Search / examination 16
29.03.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7