Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0678485

EP0678485 - Method of producing a protective coating for layered glazing element [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/43]Protective coating for layered glazing element
[2001/04]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE
18, avenue d'Alsace
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[2001/28]
Former [1995/43]For all designated states
SAINT-GOBAIN VITRAGE
18, avenue d'Alsace
F-92400 Courbevoie / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Rasker, Erik
Sevillastraat 83
B-2100 Deurne / BE
02 / Halleux, Jean-Marc
rue du Chainia, 11a
B-5081 La Bruyere / BE
[1995/43]
Representative(s)Renous Chan, Véronique , et al
Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, Quai Lucien Lefranc
93300 Aubervilliers / FR
[N/P]
Former [1995/43]Renous Chan, Véronique , et al
Saint-Gobain Recherche, 39, Quai Lucien Lefranc
F-93300 Aubervilliers / FR
Application number, filing date95400842.113.04.1995
[1995/43]
Priority number, dateFR1994000461118.04.1994         Original published format: FR 9404611
[1995/43]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0678485
Date:25.10.1995
Language:FR
[1995/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0678485
Date:28.02.1996
[1996/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0678485
Date:05.12.2001
Language:FR
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.1996
ClassificationInternational:C03C17/38, G02B1/10
[1996/09]
Former International [1995/43]C03C17/38, G02B5/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/43]
Extension statesSI20.04.1995
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Schutzbeschichtung für Schichtverglasungselement[2001/04]
English:Method of producing a protective coating for layered glazing element[2001/04]
French:Procédé de dépôt d'un revêtement protecteur pour élément vitré à couches[2001/04]
Former [1995/43]Schutzbeschichtung für Schichtverglasungselement
Former [1995/43]Protective coating for layered glazing element
Former [1995/43]Revêtement protecteur pour élément vitré à couches
Examination procedure08.08.1996Examination requested  [1996/41]
21.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.07.2001Fee for grant paid
19.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
06.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
10.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [2003/30]DE06.03.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS5422216  ;
 DD252368  [ ] (DRESDEN LACKFABRIK [DD]);
 [A]EP0396449  (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 13 *;
 [A]WO9116197  (CARDINAL IG CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-26 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 79, no. 13, Database accession no. 79-24443B, & JPS5422216 A 19790220 (NISHIMURA H) [X] 1,2,5,7,9-12 * abstract *
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19880711), vol. 109, no. 2, Database accession no. 10647z, page 261 [X] 1-5,7,8 * abstract *