Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0684622

EP0684622 - Circuit breaker with reduced self compression [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEC ALSTHOM T ET D SA
38, Avenue Kléber
75016 Paris / FR
[2000/15]
Former [1995/48]For all designated states
GEC ALSTHOM T ET D SA
38, Avenue Kléber
F-75016 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Dufournet, Denis
26 E, Rue de la Vieguerse
F-69500 Bron / FR
[1995/48]
Representative(s)Gosse, Michel , et al
ALSTOM Technologies
C.I.P.D.
23/25 Avenue Morane-Saulnier
92360 Meudon La Foret / FR
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]Gosse, Michel , et al
ALSTOM FRANCE SA Département de Propriété Industrielle, 38, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Former [1995/48]Fournier, Michel , et al
SOSPI 14-16, rue de la Baume
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date95401121.915.05.1995
[1995/48]
Priority number, dateFR1994000612819.05.1994         Original published format: FR 9406128
[1995/48]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0684622
Date:29.11.1995
Language:FR
[1995/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0684622
Date:12.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP07.07.1995
ClassificationInternational:H01H33/91
[1995/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   PT,   SE [1995/48]
TitleGerman:Lastschalter mit reduzierter Kompression[1995/48]
English:Circuit breaker with reduced self compression[1995/48]
French:Disjoncteur à autocompression réduite[1995/48]
Examination procedure16.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/24]
08.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.1999Fee for grant paid
04.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4025553  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * column 5, paragraph 3; figure 6 *;
 [DA]EP0591039  (GEC ALSTHOM T & D SA [FR]) [DA] 1 * column A; figure 1A; claim 1 *
by applicantEP0591039