Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0686386

EP0686386 - Cosmetic and dermatologic composition comprising a stable aqueous dispersion of phytantriol-based gel particles containing a long-chain surfactant as dispersant and stabilizer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.06.2001
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.08.2001 [2001/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'OREAL, S.A.
14, Rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[2000/35]
Former [1995/50]For all designated states
L'OREAL, S.A.
14, Rue Royale
F-75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Ribier, Alain
5, rue Jean-Jacques Rousseau
F-75001 Paris / FR
02 / Biatry, Bruno
22, rue Taine
F-75012 Paris / FR
[1995/50]
Representative(s)Stalla-Bourdillon, Bernard
NONY & ASSOCIES, 3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1995/50]Stalla-Bourdillon, Bernard
NONY & ASSOCIES, 29, rue Cambacérès
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date95401325.608.06.1995
[1995/50]
Priority number, dateFR1994000703108.06.1994         Original published format: FR 9407031
[1995/50]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0686386
Date:13.12.1995
Language:FR
[1995/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0686386
Date:30.08.2000
Language:FR
[2000/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.09.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/00, A61K7/48
[1995/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1995/50]
TitleGerman:Dermatologische und kosmetische Zusammensetzung aus eine stabile wässrige Dispersion von Phytantriol enthaltende Gelpartikels mit einem langkettiges Tensid als Dispergens und Stabilisator[1995/50]
English:Cosmetic and dermatologic composition comprising a stable aqueous dispersion of phytantriol-based gel particles containing a long-chain surfactant as dispersant and stabilizer[1995/50]
French:Composition cosmétique ou dermatologique sous forme d'une dispersion, aqueuse et stable, de particules de gel cubique à base de phytantriol et contenant un agent tensioactif à chaine grasse en tant qu'agent dispersant et stabilisant[1995/50]
Examination procedure13.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/11]
14.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.2000Fee for grant paid
13.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.05.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
01.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[DA]WO9306921  (GS BIOCHEM AB [SE]);
 [DA]WO8402076  (FLUIDCARBON INTERNATIONAL AB [SE]);
 [DA]JPH0469316
 [DA]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 16, Database accession no. 92-127237, & JPH0469316 A 19920304 (KURARAY) [DA] * abstract *
by applicantUS5151272
 JPH0469316
 WO9306921
    - LA RECHERCHE, (199203), vol. 23, pages 306 - 315
    - LIPID TECHNOLOGY, (199004), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 42 - 45
    - J.L. LEVEQUE ET AL., "Impedance methods for studying skin moisturization", JOURN. SOC. COSMET. CHEM., (198312), vol. 34, pages 419 - 428