Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0702010

EP0702010 - Benzopyranderivatives, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2001
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.02.2001 [2001/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADIR ET COMPAGNIE
1 rue Carle Hébert
92415 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
[2000/11]
Former [1996/12]For all designated states
ADIR ET COMPAGNIE
1 rue Carle Hébert
F-92415 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Baziard-Mouysset, Geneviève, Faculté de Pharmacie
Lab. Chimie Pharmaceut., 35 Chemin des Maraîchers
F-31400 Toulouse / FR
02 / Younes, Sallouma, Faculté de Pharmacie
Lab. Chimie Pharmaceut., 35 Chemin des Maraîchers
F-31400 Toulouse / FR
03 / Labssita, Youssef, Faculté de Pharmacie
Lab. Chimie Pharmaceut., 35 Chemin des Maraîchers
F-31400 Toulouse / FR
04 / Payard, Marc
8 Impasse Gabriel Voisin
F-31130 Balma / FR
05 / Caignard, Daniel-Henri
69 rue Brancion
F-75015 Paris / FR
06 / Renard, Pierre
50 Avenue de Villeneuve l'Etang
F-78000 Versailles / FR
07 / Rettori, Marie-Claire
5 rue Victor Hugo
F-92400 Courbevoie / FR
[1996/12]
Application number, filing date95402076.414.09.1995
[1996/12]
Priority number, dateFR1994001098715.09.1994         Original published format: FR 9410987
[1996/12]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0702010
Date:20.03.1996
Language:FR
[1996/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0702010
Date:15.03.2000
Language:FR
[2000/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP09.11.1995
ClassificationInternational:C07D311/66, C07D307/81, C07D311/58, C07D311/16, C07D295/18, C07D295/08
[1996/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/12]
TitleGerman:Benzopyranverbindungen, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und diese enthaltende pharmazeutischen Zubereitungen[1996/12]
English:Benzopyranderivatives, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them[1996/12]
French:Nouveaux dérivés du benzopyrane, leur procédé de préparation et les compositions pharmaceutiques qui les contiennent[1996/12]
Examination procedure18.09.1995Examination requested  [1996/12]
29.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.1999Fee for grant paid
02.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
03.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2157424  (ALBERT AG CHEM WERKE) [A] 1-10 *Page 35-39: révendications* *Page 41: exemple 20*;
 [A]EP0076996  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 *Page 118-123: révendications*