Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0715457

EP0715457 - Signal detecting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2001
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.07.2001 [2001/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/23]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Natsume, Yoshitaka, c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1996/23]
Representative(s)Thévenet, Jean-Bruno , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1996/23]Thévenet, Jean-Bruno , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date95402698.530.11.1995
[1996/23]
Priority number, dateJP1994032123830.11.1994         Original published format: JP 32123894
[1996/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0715457
Date:05.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0715457
Date:10.07.1996
[1996/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0715457
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/455, H03D1/22, // H04N5/60
[1996/28]
Former International [1996/23]H04N5/455
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   NL [1996/23]
TitleGerman:Signaldetektorvorrichtung[1996/23]
English:Signal detecting apparatus[1996/23]
French:Dispositif de détection de signal[1996/23]
Examination procedure20.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/09]
02.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.04.2000Fee for grant paid
27.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US4811096  (GAKUMURA HIROKI [JP]) [X] 1,3,11 * column W *;
 [A]US5337091  (HARFORD JACK R [US], et al) [A] 1,7,9,11,12,14,16-18 * column 4, line 50 - column 6, line 3 *;
 [A]JPS5990471  ;
 [A]EP0445579  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1,7,9,11,12,14,16-18 * column W *;
 [A]US4641179  (LOCICERO JOSEPH L [US], et al) [A] 1,7,9,11,12,14,16-18 * column 4, line 16 - line 47 *;
 [A]US4188639  (MURAKAMI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,6-8,10,12,13 * column W *;
 [A]US3697685  (LUNN GERALD K);
 [A]DE2016155  (IMP GMBH)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840920), vol. 8, no. 206, Database accession no. (E - 267), [A] 1,7,9,11,12,14 * abstract *
 [A]  - KAMM W., "Neue verlustleistungsarme integrierte Schaltungen für die ZF-Signalverarbeitung", FERNSEH UND KINOTECHNIK, BERLIN DE, (19880530), vol. 42, no. 5, pages 221 - 226, XP002003301 [A] 1,7,9,11,12,14,16-18 * column W *