Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0718299

EP0718299 - Tricyclic oxime ethers process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADIR ET COMPAGNIE
1 rue Carle Hébert
92415 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
[2000/14]
Former [1996/26]For all designated states
ADIR ET COMPAGNIE
1 rue Carle Hébert
F-92415 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Rault, Sylvain
Route de Saint-Pierre sur Dives
F-14370 Moult / FR
02 / Robba, Max
4, rue Massillon
F-75004 Paris / FR
03 / Lancelot, Jean-Charles
Tour en Bessin RN 13
F-14400 Le Bourg / FR
04 / Prunier, Hervé
19, rue Durandal
F-14000 Caen / FR
05 / Renard, Pierre
50, avenue de Villeneuve l'Etang
F-78000 Versailles / FR
06 / Pfeiffer, Bruno
6, rue Jean Thomas
F-95600 Eaubonne / FR
07 / Guardiola-Lemaitre, Béatrice
7, avenue du Val Lecamus
F-92210 Saint-Cloud / FR
08 / Rettori, Marie-Claire
5, rue Victor Hugo
F-92400 Courbevoie / FR
[1996/26]
Application number, filing date95402865.019.12.1995
[1996/26]
Priority number, dateFR1994001543122.12.1994         Original published format: FR 9415431
[1996/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0718299
Date:26.06.1996
Language:FR
[1996/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0718299
Date:05.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07D487/04, C07D495/14, A61K31/40, // (C07D487/04, 209:00, 209:00),(C07D495/14, 333:00, 209:00, 209:00)
[1996/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/26]
TitleGerman:Trizyklische Oximether, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und diese enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen[1996/26]
English:Tricyclic oxime ethers process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them[1996/26]
French:Ethers d'oximes tricycliques, leur procédé de préparation et les compositions pharmaceutiques qui les contiennent[1999/38]
Former [1996/26]Nouveaux éthers d'oximes tricycliques, leur procédé de préparation et les compositions pharmaceutiques qui les contiennent
Examination procedure27.12.1995Examination requested  [1996/26]
25.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.1999Fee for grant paid
08.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]  C. LAPORTE-WOJCIK ET AL, "Thienopyrrolizines. Synthesis of 4-imino (and 4-amino)-4H-thieno(2,3-b)pyrrolizines", HETEROCYCLES, vol. 23, no. 6, pages 1471 - 1477, [A] 1 * page 1472 *
 [A]  S. RAULT ET AL, "A convenient synthesis of new aminopyrroloindoles via an imminium salt", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS., OXFORD GB, vol. 26, no. 19, pages 2305 - 2308, [A] 1 * page 2306 *
 [A]  F. J. VILLANI ET AL, "Oximino ethers: Dialkylaminoalkyl derivatives", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, vol. 58, no. 1, pages 138 - 141, XP002151041 [A] 1 * page 140; example XIX; table II *
 [A]  S. RAULT ET AL, "Synthèse et étude préliminaire de l'activité psychotrope d'alkylamino et iminopyrrolo(1,2-a)indoles", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY.CHIMICA THERAPEUTICA., CHATENAY-MALABRY FR, vol. 26, no. 9, pages 939 - 946, [A] 1,13,14 * page 939 - page 941 *