Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0720177 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0720177



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 838
21.11.2005 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
15.11.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 30
12.08.2005 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 29
18.07.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
08.07.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
07.07.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
06.07.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.07.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
05.07.2005 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 3
05.07.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
05.07.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
05.07.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
24.06.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.06.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.06.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.06.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
15.06.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.06.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.06.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.06.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.06.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.06.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
02.06.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.05.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.05.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.05.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Search / examination 1
21.05.2005 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 1
20.05.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.05.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
02.05.2005 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
29.12.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
23.12.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.12.2004 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Appeal 2
20.12.2004 Request for transfer of rights Appeal 2
14.12.2004 Request for transfer of rights Appeal 2
02.04.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
02.04.2004 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Appeal 2
02.04.2004 Request for transfer of rights Appeal 1
03.03.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
02.03.2004 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Appeal 2
10.01.2004 Request for transfer of rights Appeal 2
15.04.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
15.04.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
09.04.2003 Communication: Transfer of procedural status Appeal 1
15.03.2003 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
15.03.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
15.03.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
15.03.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.01.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
20.01.2003 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 3
10.01.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.01.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.10.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
06.09.2002 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 2
21.08.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
21.08.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
21.08.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
12.08.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
07.08.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
01.07.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
28.06.2002 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Appeal 1
28.06.2002 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Appeal 2
13.05.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
29.04.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 18
26.04.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 19
11.04.2002 Authorisation Appeal 2
11.04.2002 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
16.03.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
05.03.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
28.02.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
24.01.2002 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 3
23.01.2002 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
17.01.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.10.2001 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 3
25.10.2001 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
24.10.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
24.10.2001 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
24.10.2001 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
24.10.2001 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
19.10.2001 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
10.10.2001 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
06.10.2001 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
27.08.2001 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.08.2001 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.08.2001 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 2
27.08.2001 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 2
18.08.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
16.08.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
02.08.2001 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
02.08.2001 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 2
01.08.2001 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
26.07.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
20.07.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
18.06.2001 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
18.06.2001 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
18.06.2001 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
18.06.2001 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 14
18.06.2001 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
20.02.2001 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
20.02.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
20.02.2001 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
20.02.2001 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.01.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.12.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.12.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
15.12.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
15.12.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
14.12.2000 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
14.12.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
14.12.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
13.12.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
12.12.2000 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
01.09.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.09.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.08.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.08.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
02.08.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.07.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.07.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.07.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.07.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
13.07.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
13.07.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
13.06.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.06.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.06.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.06.2000 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
08.06.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.06.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
08.06.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
05.06.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.06.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.06.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.06.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.06.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.05.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.05.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
25.05.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.05.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.05.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
25.05.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
25.05.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
11.05.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
09.05.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.05.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2000 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.01.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.12.1999 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 1
09.11.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.11.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.10.1999 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
21.10.1999 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
17.06.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.06.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.06.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
04.06.1999 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.05.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.04.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.04.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
22.04.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.04.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
22.04.1999 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.04.1999 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
20.04.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.04.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
15.04.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.04.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.04.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.04.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
12.04.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
08.04.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.04.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
08.04.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
12.03.1999 N/A Opposition 1
12.03.1999 Request for documents Opposition 1
24.02.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.02.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.02.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
03.02.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.02.1999 N/A Opposition 1
03.02.1999 N/A Opposition 1
03.02.1999 Request for documents Opposition 1
25.01.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.01.1999 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.01.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
21.01.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
21.01.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
21.01.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
21.01.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.01.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.01.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.01.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
15.01.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
15.01.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.01.1999 Authorisation Opposition 1
13.01.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 45
13.01.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
13.01.1999 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
12.01.1999 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
05.03.1998 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
21.11.1997 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.11.1997 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
21.11.1997 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
14.10.1997 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
02.10.1997 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
11.08.1997 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
11.08.1997 Text intended for grant Search / examination 8
21.07.1997 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
12.08.1996 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
22.04.1996 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
09.04.1996 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
19.03.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.03.1996 European search report Search / examination 2
19.03.1996 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
07.03.1996 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
26.12.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.12.1995 Authorisation Search / examination 1
26.12.1995 Claims Search / examination 2
26.12.1995 Description Search / examination 5
26.12.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.12.1995 Drawings Search / examination 1
26.12.1995 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
26.12.1995 Priority document Search / examination 13
26.12.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7