Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0712210

EP0712210 - Transmission circuit for data in asynchronous mode via a free receiving frequency coupled with the sending frequency [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2001
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.06.2001 [2001/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.A.
7, Avenue Galliéni
94250 Gentilly / FR
[1999/05]
Former [1996/20]For all designated states
SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.A.
7, Avenue Galliéni
F-94250 Gentilly / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Belot, Didier
178, Rue Alfred Buttin
F-38140 Rives / FR
02 / Dugoujon, Laurent
Le Prayer
F-38720 Saint Bernard du Touvet / FR
[1996/20]
Representative(s)de Beaumont, Michel
1bis, rue Champollion
38000 Grenoble / FR
[N/P]
Former [1996/20]de Beaumont, Michel
1bis, rue Champollion
F-38000 Grenoble / FR
Application number, filing date95410126.708.11.1995
[1996/20]
Priority number, dateFR1994001378609.11.1994         Original published format: FR 9413786
[1996/20]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0712210
Date:15.05.1996
Language:FR
[1996/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0712210
Date:12.07.2000
Language:FR
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:H03L7/07, H04L7/00
[1996/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/20]
TitleGerman:Schaltung zur Übertragung von Daten in asynchronem Modus über eine mit der Sendefrequenz verriegelte freie Empfangsfrequenz[1996/20]
English:Transmission circuit for data in asynchronous mode via a free receiving frequency coupled with the sending frequency[1996/20]
French:Circuit de transmission de données en mode asynchrone à fréquence libre de réception calée sur la fréquence d'émission[1996/20]
Examination procedure17.10.1996Examination requested  [1996/51]
18.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2000Fee for grant paid
30.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[AD]US5302919  (ABE AKIRA [JP]) [AD] 1-3 * column 1, line 21 - column 2, line 14 * * column 9, line 38 - line 44 * * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]EP0480597  (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 5 * * column 6, line 25 - line 43 * * column 7, line 15 - line 22 * * column 9, line 34 - line 44 * * column 13, line 14 - line 21 * * column 19, line 19 - line 26 * * figures 1,3,5 *;
 [A]EP0138434  (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 1 - line 21; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5283483  (LABER CARLOS A [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 2, line 32 - line 36 * * column 6, line 62 - line 64 * * figures 5,6 *;
 [A]WO9314570  (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 15 * * page 6, line 36 - page 7, line 21; figure 1 *
by applicantUS5302919