EP0681014 - Elastomeric silicone composition and its use, mainly coating of airbags [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHODIA CHIMIE 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [1998/16] |
Former [1995/45] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peccoux, Pierre-Michel 104, rue Baraban F-69003 Lyon / FR | 02 /
Lorenzetti, Dominique 7, Chemin du Sycomore F-69300 Caluire / FR | [1995/45] | Representative(s) | Trolliet, Maurice, et al Rhodia Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 40 Rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | Trolliet, Maurice, et al RHODIA CHIMIE Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, CRIT Carrières, B.P. 62 69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1995/45] | Trolliet, Maurice RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, Centre de Recherches des Carrières, B.P. 62 F-69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 95420112.5 | 26.04.1995 | [1995/45] | Priority number, date | FR19940005652 | 03.05.1994 Original published format: FR 9405652 | [1995/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0681014 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0681014 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C09D183/04, D06M15/643 | [1995/45] | CPC: |
B60R21/235 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C09D183/04 (EP,US);
D06M15/643 (EP,US);
D06M15/647 (EP,US);
D06M15/65 (EP,US);
D06N3/128 (EP,US);
C08G77/12 (EP,US);
C08G77/14 (EP,US);
C08G77/20 (EP,US);
C08G77/24 (EP,US);
C08G77/70 (EP,US);
C08G77/80 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31562 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31565 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L83/00, C08L2666/28 (EP,US);
C09D183/04, C08L83/00, C08L2666/28 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/45] | Title | German: | Elastomerische Silikonen-Zusammensetzung und ihre Verwendung, hauptsächlich zum Beschichten von aufblasbaren Säcken, s.g. Airbags | [1995/45] | English: | Elastomeric silicone composition and its use, mainly coating of airbags | [1995/45] | French: | Composition élastomère silicone et ses applications, notamment pour l'enduction de sac gonflable, destiné à la protection d'un occupant de véhicule | [1995/45] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/24] | 11.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2000 | ES | 05.07.2000 | GR | 05.07.2000 | PT | 06.10.2000 | IE | 05.02.2001 | [2004/07] |
Former [2002/26] | AT | 05.07.2000 | |
ES | 05.07.2000 | ||
PT | 06.10.2000 | ||
IE | 05.02.2001 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 05.07.2000 | |
PT | 06.10.2000 | ||
IE | 05.02.2001 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 05.07.2000 | |
IE | 05.07.2000 | ||
PT | 06.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/18] | AT | 05.07.2000 | |
PT | 06.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 05.07.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0326712 (TORAY SILICONE CO [JP]) [Y] 1-17 * page 4, line 31; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0543401 (TOSHIBA SILICONE [JP]) [Y] 1-17* claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0553840 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [AD] 1-17 * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0576984 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [Y] 1-17 * page 2, line 35 * * page 3, line 34 - line 39 * |