Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0682885

EP0682885 - Device for retaining a helmet on the occiput [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TIME SPORT INTERNATIONAL
39, rue de Verdun
58 640 Varennes-Vauzelles / FR
[2000/15]
Former [1999/52]For all designated states
SHINE S.A.
34, bd de la Beaujoire
44300 Nantes / FR
Former [1999/34]For all designated states
OVERFORING, Société à responsabilité Limitée dite
La Cour d'Hénon, Site Economique - Cisse
86170 Neuville de Poitou / FR
Former [1995/47]For all designated states
OVERFORING, Société à responsabilité Limitée dite
La Cour d'Hénon, Site Economique - Cisse
F-86170 Neuville de Poitou / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Lallemand, Jean-Luc
10 rue de la Tranchée
F-86000 Poitiers / FR
[1995/47]
Representative(s)Kohn, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Philippe Kohn
30, rue Hoche
93500 Pantin / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/01]Kohn, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Philippe Kohn, 30, rue Hoche
93500 Pantin / FR
Former [1995/47]Thébault, Jean-Louis , et al
Cabinet Thébault S.A. 1 Allées de Chartres
F-33000 Bordeaux / FR
Application number, filing date95450006.209.05.1995
[1995/47]
Priority number, dateFR1994000601410.05.1994         Original published format: FR 9406014
[1995/47]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0682885
Date:22.11.1995
Language:FR
[1995/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0682885
Date:25.08.1999
Language:FR
[1999/34]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0682885
Date:09.06.2004
Language:FR
[2004/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.1995
ClassificationInternational:A42B3/10
[1995/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [1995/47]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Helmes am Hinterkopf[1995/47]
English:Device for retaining a helmet on the occiput[1995/47]
French:Dispositif de fixation occipitale d'un casque[1995/47]
Examination procedure10.05.1996Examination requested  [1996/29]
05.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.11.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.1999Fee for grant paid
25.01.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.05.2000   
BELL SPORTS EUROPE
Z.I. du Buisson, rue Matthieu Vallat
F-42230 ROCHE LA MOLIERE / FR
Opponent's representative
Hasenrader, Hubert Karl
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2000/29]
Opponent(s)01  23.05.2000   
BELL SPORTS EUROPE
Z.I. du Buisson, rue Matthieu Vallat
F-42230 ROCHE LA MOLIERE / FR
Opponent's representative
Hasenrader, Hubert
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
05.07.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.01.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.03.2001Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2001Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
05.03.2002Date of oral proceedings
02.04.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.04.2002Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
15.10.2003Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.11.2003Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.02.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
08.04.2004Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition22.05.2002Appeal received No.  T0552/02
15.10.2003Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
15.10.2003Date of oral proceedings
06.11.2003Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US3852821  (L. S. MICKEL) [X] 1,7-9 * column 1, line 60 - line 68 * * column 2, line 32 - line 68 * * column 3, line 1 - line 34 * * figure - *;
 [A]US3591863  (H. E. RICHARD) [A] 1,8 * column 2, line 4 - line 42 * * column 3, line 28 - line 75 * * column 4, line 1 - line 38 * * figure - *;
 [A]US3323134  (W. M. SWYERS) [A] 1,8 * column 1, line 64 - line 72 * * colonne 2, lignes 1 - 9, 70 - 72 * * column 3, line 1 - line 75 * * column 4, line 1 - line 26 * * figure - *;
 [A]DE8601332U  (PETER KÜPPER KG CODEBA);
 [DA]EP0302211  (RÖMER GMBH);
 [A]US2846683  (E.R. DYE ET AL);
 [A]EP0346618  (GENTEX CORPORATION);
 [PA]WO9501739  (GIRO SPORT DESIGN, INC.) [PA] 1,2,7-10 * page 5, line 20 - page 9, line 13 * * figures 1,2,5-8 *