Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0682885 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0682885



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 564
28.04.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
28.04.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
23.04.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 3
08.04.2004 Claims Opposition 2
08.04.2004 Claims Opposition 2
08.04.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.03.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.02.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.02.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
17.02.2004 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 15
10.02.2004 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
27.11.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 25
06.11.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 7
13.10.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.10.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
10.10.2003 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
10.10.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
10.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
09.10.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
09.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.10.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
07.10.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
01.10.2003 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 5
08.09.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
05.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
29.08.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.08.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
21.08.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
18.08.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.08.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
07.08.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
06.08.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.08.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.07.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
25.07.2003 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
25.07.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.06.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
27.06.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
12.06.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.06.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.04.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.04.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.01.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
05.12.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
20.11.2002 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Appeal 1
20.11.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
08.11.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.10.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.10.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.10.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.10.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.10.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.10.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 14
30.10.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 14
30.10.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.10.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.10.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.10.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.10.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.10.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.10.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.10.2002 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.10.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
17.10.2002 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
17.10.2002 Request concerning the applicant/representative Appeal 1
13.09.2002 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 3
09.09.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.09.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.09.2002 F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds Appeal 1
03.09.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.08.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.08.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
17.08.2002 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
07.06.2002 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.06.2002 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
05.06.2002 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
24.05.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
24.05.2002 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
22.05.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
11.04.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.04.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.04.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.04.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.04.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
02.04.2002 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 3
02.04.2002 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
02.04.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 10
02.04.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.03.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
06.03.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
28.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
28.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.02.2002 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
25.02.2002 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
25.02.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
20.02.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 3
11.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.02.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
05.02.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.02.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
31.01.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
30.01.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
25.01.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
06.10.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.10.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.09.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.09.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.09.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
24.09.2001 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
24.09.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
24.09.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
30.07.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.07.2001 Authorisation of representative Opposition 2
20.07.2001 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 6
17.07.2001 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 8
05.06.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.06.2001 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
16.05.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.05.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.03.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.01.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
05.01.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
06.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.11.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
27.10.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
05.07.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.07.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
05.06.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.06.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.05.2000 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
25.05.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
23.05.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
28.02.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
15.02.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
15.02.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
10.02.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
08.02.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
07.02.2000 Request for assignment Search / examination 3
03.02.2000 Request for assignment Search / examination 1
17.11.1999 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
29.10.1999 Request for assignment Search / examination 18
26.10.1999 Request for assignment Search / examination 17
15.07.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
30.01.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.01.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
30.01.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
02.11.1998 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
24.10.1998 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.07.1998 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 3
16.07.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
16.07.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
16.07.1998 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
08.07.1998 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
26.06.1998 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
12.06.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
12.06.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.06.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
30.03.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.03.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.12.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
01.08.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
11.07.1997 Late/insufficient payment of the renewal fee without additional fee Search / examination 1
04.03.1997 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.05.1996 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
10.05.1996 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 2
09.10.1995 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
20.09.1995 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.09.1995 European search report Search / examination 2
13.06.1995 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
13.06.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.06.1995 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.05.1995 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
30.05.1995 Priority document Search / examination 16
09.05.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.05.1995 Claims Search / examination 2
09.05.1995 Description Search / examination 8
09.05.1995 Drawings Search / examination 5
09.05.1995 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
09.05.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6