Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0674320

EP0674320 - Memory device with programmable self-refreshing and testing methods therefore [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 23.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/39]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Douse, David Elson
RR No. 1 Box 48
Jericho, Vermont 05465 / US
02 / Hedberg, Erik Leigh
20 Lang Drive
Essex Junction, Vermont 05452 / US
03 / Ellis, Wayne Frederick
Box 163, Snowflake Ridge
Jericho, Vermont 05465 / US
[1995/39]
Representative(s)de Pena, Alain , et al
Compagnie IBM France Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle
06610 La Gaude / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/12]de Pena, Alain , et al
Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle
06610 La Gaude / FR
Former [1995/39]Lattard, Nicole
Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle
F-06610 La Gaude / FR
Application number, filing date95480025.621.03.1995
[1995/39]
Priority number, dateUS1994021657822.03.1994         Original published format: US 216578
[1995/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0674320
Date:27.09.1995
Language:EN
[1995/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0674320
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.1995
ClassificationInternational:G11C29/00, G11C11/406
[1995/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/39]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Prüfung eines Speichers mit programmierbarer Selbstauffrischung[1995/39]
English:Memory device with programmable self-refreshing and testing methods therefore[1995/39]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour tester une mémoire avec auto-regénération programmable[1995/39]
Examination procedure19.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/12]
13.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.1999Fee for grant paid
20.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
17.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
15.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR24.05.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2001/24]FR20.10.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0541060  (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,8-10,21 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH0612865  (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 []EP0592688  (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * abstract *
 [A]  "Method for testinf embedded shift register in a DRAM chip", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (198705), vol. 29, no. 12, page 5505, [A] 1-5