Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0707270

EP0707270 - Method and apparatus for validating system operation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.09.2002
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/16]For all designated states
INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lewis, David O.
1609 Ridge Drive, NE
Rochester, MN 55906 / US
[1996/16]
Representative(s)Etorre, Yves Nicolas
Compagnie IBM France Département Propriété Intellectuelle Le Plan-du-Bois
06610 La Gaude / FR
[2009/40]
Former [2000/26]Etorre, Yves Nicolas
Compagnie IBM France Département Propriété Intellectuelle Le Plan du Bois
06610 La Gaude / FR
Former [1998/45]Therias, Philippe
Compagnie IBM FRANCE, Département de Propriété Intellectuelle
06610 La Gaude / FR
Former [1996/16]Schuffenecker, Thierry
Compagnie IBM France, Département de Propriété Intellectuelle
F-06610 La Gaude / FR
Application number, filing date95480137.922.09.1995
[1996/16]
Priority number, dateUS1994032224612.10.1994         Original published format: US 322246
[1996/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0707270
Date:17.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0707270
Date:04.09.1996
[1996/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0707270
Date:21.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:G06F12/14, G06F1/00
[1996/35]
Former International [1996/16]G06F12/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/16]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Prüfung der Gültigkeit des Betriebs eines Systems[1996/16]
English:Method and apparatus for validating system operation[1996/16]
French:Procédé et appareil pour la validation du fonctionnement d'un système[1996/16]
Examination procedure27.08.1996Examination requested  [1996/43]
03.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.02.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2001Fee for grant paid
17.04.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
17.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0425053  (TRT TELECOM RADIO ELECTR ;PHILIPS NV (NL)) [X] 9 * column A * * column 8, line 20 - line 39 * * column 9, line 44 - column 10, line 32 * * figure 1 * [A] ;
 [A]EP0302710  (IBM) [A] 1,3,5-9 * column A * * page 4, line 59 - page 5, line 4 * * page 8, line 22 - line 42 * * figures 1,6 *;
 [A]EP0175359  (WANG LABORATORIES) [A] 1,3,5-9 * page 7, line 1 - line 20 * * page 9, line 13 - page 10, line 26 *;
 [A]WO9323807  (SIEMENS NIXDORF INF SYST ;GRUNO GERHARD (DE)) [A] 1,5,7,10,11 * abstract * * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 33 * * page 9, line 13 - page 10, line 26 *
ExaminationEP0682315