EP0667189 - Mounting means for vibration member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. 8100 W. Florissant Avenue St. Louis Missouri 63136 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. 8100 W. Florissant Avenue St. Louis Missouri 63136 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cunningham, Patrick M. 289 Cook Lane Beacon Falls, Connecticut 06403 / US | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 95630011.5 | 09.02.1995 | [1995/33] | Priority number, date | US19940194108 | 09.02.1994 Original published format: US 194108 | [1995/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0667189 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0667189 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | [1997/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667189 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B06B3/00, B05B17/06 | [1997/26] | CPC: |
B06B3/00 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/33] | B06B3/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/33] | Title | German: | Befestigungsvorrichtung für ein Vibrationselement | [1995/33] | English: | Mounting means for vibration member | [1995/33] | French: | Dispositif de montage pour un élément vibrateur | [1999/34] |
Former [1995/33] | Dispositif de montage pour un élément de vibration | Examination procedure | 09.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 12.01.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0057466 (EATON CORP [US]); | [DA]US4647336 (COENEN JOSEPH D [US], et al) [DA] 1,6 * column 4, line 53 - column 6, line 5; figures 4-6 * |