Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0695020

EP0695020 - Auxiliary starting switched reluctance motor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.
8100 W. Florissant Avenue St. Louis
Missouri 63136 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/05]For all designated states
EMERSON ELECTRIC CO.
8100 W. Florissant Avenue
St. Louis Missouri 63136 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Horst, Gary Edward
618 Crofton Circle Court
Manchester, Missouri 63021 / US
[1996/05]
Representative(s)Waxweiler, Jean , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502
1015 Luxembourg / LU
[N/P]
Former [1996/05]Waxweiler, Jean , et al
Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502
L-1015 Luxembourg / LU
Application number, filing date95630086.718.07.1995
[1996/05]
Priority number, dateUS1994028007725.07.1994         Original published format: US 280077
[1996/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0695020
Date:31.01.1996
[1996/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0695020
Date:19.11.1997
[1997/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0695020
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:H02K19/06, H02K29/00, H02P6/20
[2001/47]
Former International [1997/47]H02K29/00, H02K19/24, H02P6/20
Former International [1996/05]H02K29/00, H02P6/20
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/05]
TitleGerman:Anlaufhilfe für einen getakteten Reluktanzmotor[2001/47]
English:Auxiliary starting switched reluctance motor[1996/05]
French:Moteur à reluctance variable avec dispositif auxiliaire de démarrage[2001/47]
Former [1996/05]Anlaufhilfe für einen geschaltenen Reluktanzmotor
Former [1996/05]Moteur à reluctance en marche avec dispositif auxiliare de départ
Examination procedure17.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/38]
21.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2002Fee for grant paid
28.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
17.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
13.07.1998M01   Fee paid on   17.07.1998
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE11.09.2002
FR11.09.2002
IT11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
DE12.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]BE11.09.2002
FR11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
DE12.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/04]BE11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
DE12.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/48]BE11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
DE12.12.2002
Former [2003/45]NL11.09.2002
DE12.12.2002
Former [2003/22]NL11.09.2002
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0601818  (SWITCHED RELUCTANCE DRIVES LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,9,10,11,18-20,21,28,29 [Y] 3-6,12-14,17,22,30-31,33;
 [YA]DE4003455  (MENGE EBERHARD DIPL ING [DE]) [Y] 3,4,6,12,14,22,30 [A] 7,8,15,16,24-27,34;
 [YDA]US5294856  (HORST GARY E [US]) [YD] 5,13,17,31,32,33 [A] 23