Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0671249
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0671249Global Dossier 26.01.2000B1
EP0671249 13.09.1995A1
Priority number Date
EP95810126 28.02.1995
EP94810141 07.03.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GR3033053T 31.08.2000T3
Priority number Date
EP95810126 28.02.1995
EP94810141 07.03.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5776381 07.07.1998A
Priority number Date
US79268997 29.01.1997
EP94810141 07.03.1994
US39256195 23.02.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3703873BGlobal Dossier 05.10.2005B2
JPH07256658 09.10.1995A
Priority number Date
EP94810141 07.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT189155T 15.02.2000T
Priority number Date
EP94810141 07.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU700615B 07.01.1999B2
AU1355395 14.09.1995A
Priority number Date
EP94810141 07.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2143901 08.09.1995A1
Priority number Date
EP94810141 07.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1057959C 01.11.2000C
CN1112054 22.11.1995A
Priority number Date
EP94810141 07.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE59507663D 02.03.2000D1
Priority number Date
EP94810141 07.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK0671249T 26.06.2000T3
Priority number Date
EP94810141 07.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2143608T 16.05.2000T3
Priority number Date
EP94810141 07.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FI108008B 15.11.2001B
FI950982 08.09.1995A
Priority number Date
EP94810141 07.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IL112794 08.02.1998A
IL112794D 26.05.1995D0
Priority number Date
EP94810141 07.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NO309370B 22.01.2001B1
NO950860L 08.09.1995L
NO950860D 06.03.1995D0
Priority number Date
EP94810141 07.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NZ270623 29.01.1997A
Priority number Date
EP94810141 07.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT671249E 31.07.2000E
Priority number Date
EP94810141 07.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW258686B 01.10.1995B
Priority number Date
EP94810141 07.03.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ZA9501825 07.09.1995B
Priority number Date
EP94810141 07.03.1994