Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0671249

EP0671249 - Process and device for the production of optical lenses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For:BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  PT  SE 
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1235 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [1999/09]For:BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  PT  SE 
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1235 Wien / AT
Former [1999/05]For all designated states
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1235 Wien / AT
Former [1997/14]For all designated states
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Former [1995/37]For all designated states
CIBA-GEIGY AG
Klybeckstrasse 141
CH-4002 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Haase, Lothar
Hahner Strasse 55
D-51597 Morsbach/Sieg / DE
[1995/37]
Application number, filing date95810126.328.02.1995
[1995/37]
Priority number, dateEP1994081014107.03.1994         Original published format: EP 94810141
[1995/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0671249
Date:13.09.1995
Language:DE
[1995/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0671249
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.07.1995
ClassificationInternational:B29C43/36, B29D11/00, B29C31/06
[1995/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/37]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung optischen Linsen[1995/37]
English:Process and device for the production of optical lenses[1995/37]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de lentilles optiques[1995/37]
Examination procedure22.02.1996Examination requested  [1996/17]
18.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.1999Fee for grant paid
09.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
18.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4138086  (MIZUTANI YUTAKA, et al) [X] 1,5 * column 3, line 53 - column 3, line 60; figure 1 * [Y] 2,6;
 [Y]US3670066  (VALYI EMERY I) [Y] 2,6 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 18; figure 3 *