blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0688028

EP0688028 - Electromagnetic coupler [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.06.2000
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.06.2000Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.08.2000 [2000/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schmall, Karl-Heinz
Waldstrasse 20
D-76532 Baden-Baden / DE
[1995/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Schmall, Karl-Heinz
Waldstrasse 20
D-76532 Baden-Baden / DE
02 / Blessing, Michael
Gr. Maien
D-76532 Baden-Baden / DE
[1995/51]
Representative(s)Hepp, Dieter, et al
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
[N/P]
Former [1996/35]Hepp, Dieter, et al
Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
Former [1995/51]Hepp, Dieter, et al
Hepp, Wenger & Partner AG Marktgasse 18
CH-9500 Wil / CH
Application number, filing date95810366.502.06.1995
[1995/51]
Priority number, dateCH1994000192917.06.1994         Original published format: CH 192994
[1995/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0688028
Date:20.12.1995
Language:DE
[1995/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.10.1995
ClassificationIPC:H01F38/18, H01F3/02
[1995/51]
CPC:
H01F38/18 (EP); H01F3/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   IT,   SE [1995/51]
TitleGerman:Elektromagnetischer Koppler[1995/51]
English:Electromagnetic coupler[1995/51]
French:Coupleur électromagnétique[1995/51]
Examination procedure20.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/25]
03.01.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2000/31]
07.03.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2000/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
08.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.199905   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2827386  (GARBE LAHMEYER & CO AG) [A] 1,2,6,9,12 * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 10; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]JPS60161603  ;
 [A]FR2269786  (ARJONA VALLET F [ES]);
 [A]DE3537437  (TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AG [DE])
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851224), vol. 009, no. 328, Database accession no. (E - 369), & JP60161603 A 19850823 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.