Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0754934

EP0754934 - Coriolis mass flow sensor with at least one measuring tube [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2001
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.08.2001 [2001/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Endress + Hauser Flowtec AG
Kägenstrasse 7
4153 Reinach BL 1 / CH
[N/P]
Former [1997/04]For all designated states
Endress + Hauser Flowtec AG
Kägenstrasse 7
CH-4153 Reinach BL 1 / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Drahm, Wolfgang, Dr.
Grienweg 8
CH-4222 Zwingen (BL) / CH
02 / Rieder, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Fürstenstrasse 10
D-84030 Ergolding / DE
[1997/04]
Representative(s)Morstadt, Volker
Endress + Hauser Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 2222
79574 Weil am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/04]Morstadt, Volker, Dipl.-Ing.
c/o Endress + Hauser Flowtec AG Kägenstrasse 7 Postfach 435
4153 Reinach (BL) 1 / CH
Application number, filing date95810474.721.07.1995
[1997/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0754934
Date:22.01.1997
Language:DE
[1997/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0754934
Date:06.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.1995
ClassificationInternational:G01F1/84
[1997/04]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1997/04]
TitleGerman:Coriolis-Massedurchflussmesser mit mindestens einem Messrohr[1997/04]
English:Coriolis mass flow sensor with at least one measuring tube[1997/04]
French:Débitmètre massique selon le principe de Coriolis comprenant au moins un tube de mesure[1999/48]
Former [1997/04]Débimètre massique selon le principe de coriolis comprenant au moins un tube de mesure
Examination procedure22.07.1996Examination requested  [1997/04]
24.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.05.2000Fee for grant paid
27.05.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
15.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]WO8803261  (FOXBORO CO [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * page 11, line 30 - page 12, line 22; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO8901134  (LEW HYOK S [US]) [A] 1,3 * page 9, line 4 - page 10, line 26; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9303336  (MICRO MOTION INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0375300  (SCHLUMBERGER IND LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0300301  (EXAC CORP [US]) [A] 1,4 * abstract *
by applicantWO9503528
 US4949583
 US4801897
 EP19950810199