Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0746128

EP0746128 - Telephone interface circuit with impedance termination during call pauses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 25.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics Srl
Via C. Olivetti, 2
20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT
[N/P]
Former [1998/35]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.r.l.
Via C. Olivetti, 2
20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT
Former [1996/49]For all designated states
SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.r.l.
Via C. Olivetti, 2
20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Consiglio, Pietro
Via dei Bognetti 9
I-20141 Milano / IT
02 / Antonini, Carlo
Via Petrarca 2
I-21040 Venegono Inferiore (Prov.Varese) / IT
[1996/49]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1996/49]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date95830224.230.05.1995
[1996/49]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0746128
Date:04.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0746128
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.1995
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/00, H04M1/57
[1996/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/49]
TitleGerman:Fernsprechschnittstellenschaltung mit einer Abschlussimpedanz während der Pause zwischen den Rufsignalen[1996/49]
English:Telephone interface circuit with impedance termination during call pauses[1996/49]
French:Circuit d'interface de ligne téléphonique avec impédance de terminaison pendant les pauses du signal d'appel[1996/49]
Examination procedure26.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/30]
02.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.06.2002Fee for grant paid
10.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
20.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
22.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
28.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR25.09.2002
DE28.12.2002
[2006/14]
Former [2003/45]DE28.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]WO8500488  (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 18; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5117452  (CALLELE DAVID [CA], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 10 - line 32 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 18 * * column 5, line 67 - column 7, line 13; figure 4 * * column 8, line 6 - column 9, line 14; figure 5 *;
 [A]WO9403990  (PASCOM TECHNOLOGIES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1 * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 18 * * page 10, line 8 - page 15, line 2; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4465903  (BARBER ANDREW C [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 42 - line 60 * * column 3, line 38 - column 6, line 25; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4431871  (GUPTA VINITA [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 39 - column 4, line 11; figure 1 *