Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0670563

EP0670563 - Resonant tag labels and method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2001
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 18.07.2007  [2007/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FLEXCON COMPANY INC.
Flexcon Industrial Park Spencer
Massachusetts 01562 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/36]For all designated states
FLEXCON COMPANY INC.
Flexcon Industrial Park
Spencer, Massachusetts 01562 / US
Inventor(s)01 / McDonough, Neil D.
112 Richards Avenue
Paxton, Massachusetts 01612 / US
02 / Pennace, John R.
2 Knollwood Road
Paxton, Massachusetts 01612 / US
[1995/36]
Representative(s)Harrison, Michael Charles , et al
Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/05]Harrison, Michael Charles , et al
Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10
80339 München / DE
Former [1996/35]Hammond, Andrew David , et al
Albihn West AB, P.O. Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
Former [1995/36]Hammond, Andrew , et al
Albihn West AB Box 142
S-401 22 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date95850048.003.03.1995
[1995/36]
Priority number, dateUS1994020686504.03.1994         Original published format: US 206865
US1995038108631.01.1995         Original published format: US 381086
[1995/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0670563
Date:06.09.1995
Language:EN
[1995/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0670563
Date:09.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.1995
ClassificationInternational:G08B13/24
[1995/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/36]
Extension statesLT29.03.1995
SI29.03.1995
TitleGerman:Resonanzetiketten und Herstellungsverfahren[1995/36]
English:Resonant tag labels and method of making same[1995/36]
French:Etiquettes à résonance et procédé de fabrication[1995/36]
Examination procedure11.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/11]
05.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
11.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.02.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2000Fee for grant paid
19.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP00101816.7  / EP0999532
Opposition(s)10.05.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.08.2000
BE09.08.2000
CH09.08.2000
GR09.08.2000
LI09.08.2000
NL09.08.2000
DK09.11.2000
PT09.11.2000
SE09.11.2000
LU03.03.2001
IE05.03.2001
MC31.03.2001
[2007/29]
Former [2006/39]AT09.08.2000
BE09.08.2000
CH09.08.2000
GR09.08.2000
LI09.08.2000
NL09.08.2000
DK09.11.2000
PT09.11.2000
SE09.11.2000
IE05.03.2001
MC31.03.2001
Former [2004/07]AT09.08.2000
BE09.08.2000
CH09.08.2000
GR09.08.2000
LI09.08.2000
NL09.08.2000
DK09.11.2000
PT09.11.2000
SE09.11.2000
IE05.03.2001
Former [2003/45]AT09.08.2000
BE09.08.2000
CH09.08.2000
LI09.08.2000
NL09.08.2000
DK09.11.2000
PT09.11.2000
SE09.11.2000
IE05.03.2001
Former [2003/08]AT09.08.2000
BE09.08.2000
CH09.08.2000
LI09.08.2000
NL09.08.2000
PT09.11.2000
SE09.11.2000
IE05.03.2001
Former [2002/14]AT09.08.2000
BE09.08.2000
CH09.08.2000
LI09.08.2000
PT09.11.2000
SE09.11.2000
IE05.03.2001
Former [2002/02]AT09.08.2000
BE09.08.2000
CH09.08.2000
LI09.08.2000
PT09.11.2000
SE09.11.2000
Former [2001/27]AT09.08.2000
BE09.08.2000
PT09.11.2000
SE09.11.2000
Former [2001/22]AT09.08.2000
BE09.08.2000
PT09.11.2000
Former [2001/18]AT09.08.2000
PT09.11.2000
Former [2001/17]AT09.08.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0340670  (TOKAI METALS CO) [X] 1-9,13-22,24-29,32,34-40 * abstract * * page 5, column 8, line 1 - page 6, column 9, line 29; figures 1-6 *;
 [X]WO9221113  (CHECKPOINT SYSTEMS INC) [X] 1-9,13-22,24-28,34-40 * page 7, line 32 - page 16, line 20; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US5059950  (PERCHAK ROBERT) [X] 1-9,13-22,24-28,34-40 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 16; figure 1 *