Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0681371

EP0681371 - Method and arrangements for analogue-digital converters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2001
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.07.2001 [2001/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Former [1995/45]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON
S-126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Erhage, Lars
Fyradalersgatan 26
S-413 19 Göteborg / SE
[1995/45]
Representative(s)Cederbom, Hans Erik August , et al
Cegumark AB
Box 53047
400 14 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]Cederbom, Hans Erik August , et al
Cegumark AB, Box 53047
400 14 Göteborg / SE
Former [1995/45]Hammond, Andrew David
Albihn West AB, P.O. Box 142
S-401 22 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date95850086.003.05.1995
[1995/45]
Priority number, dateSE1994000153704.05.1994         Original published format: SE 9401537
[1995/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0681371
Date:08.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0681371
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.1995
ClassificationInternational:H03M1/12, H04L27/38
[1995/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/45]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Anordnung für einen Analog-Digital-Konverter[1999/40]
English:Method and arrangements for analogue-digital converters[1995/45]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour un circuit convertisseur analogue-numérique[1995/45]
Former [1995/45]Verfahren und Anordnung für eine Analog-Digital-umsetzungsschaltung
Examination procedure07.05.1996Examination requested  [1996/27]
05.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2000Fee for grant paid
05.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
25.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0500507  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-10;
 [PA]DE4306880  (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]) [PA] 1-10;
 [A]US4875049  (YOSHIDA YASUHARU [JP]) [A] 1-10