Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0684304 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0684304



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1163
15.07.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
28.07.2010 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
28.07.2010 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
30.05.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.05.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.05.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.05.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.05.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 14
09.03.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
05.03.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
03.03.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.03.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.03.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.02.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.02.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
31.01.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
31.01.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
31.01.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
29.01.2009 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 16
29.01.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
11.10.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.10.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.10.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.10.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.10.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.10.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.09.2008 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 6
24.09.2008 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
02.08.2008 Request for change of name -opponent Appeal 15
03.07.2008 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
22.11.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
13.11.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 17
18.09.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
12.09.2007 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 3
07.09.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
05.09.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
03.09.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.05.2007 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 3
27.04.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
26.04.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
24.04.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
20.04.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
20.02.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
19.02.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
15.02.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
09.02.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
06.02.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
31.01.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
31.01.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
30.01.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
23.01.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
22.01.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
05.01.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.01.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.01.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.01.2007 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.01.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.12.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.12.2006 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
21.12.2006 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
21.12.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 12
21.12.2006 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.12.2006 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.12.2006 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
21.12.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.12.2006 Means of redress Opposition 1
21.12.2006 Text intended for grant Opposition 30
14.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.07.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.07.2006 Description Opposition 2
20.07.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.07.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
12.07.2006 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
12.07.2006 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
12.07.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
12.07.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
12.07.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.07.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.07.2006 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
05.07.2006 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
28.06.2006 Annex Opposition 1
28.06.2006 Description Opposition 29
28.06.2006 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.06.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
31.05.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.05.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.05.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.05.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.05.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 6
30.05.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
24.05.2006 Claims Opposition 3
24.05.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
23.05.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.05.2006 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
19.05.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.05.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.2006 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
17.05.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
17.05.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.02.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.02.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.01.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.01.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.01.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.01.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.01.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.01.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.01.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.01.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.01.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.12.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.12.2005 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2005 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.12.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.12.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.12.2005 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.2005 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
05.12.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.12.2005 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.12.2005 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.12.2005 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.12.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
01.12.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.11.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
28.11.2005 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
28.11.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.05.2005 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.11.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.10.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.08.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.08.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.08.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.07.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 20
09.07.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.07.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
06.07.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
04.06.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
04.06.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
12.05.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
30.03.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
17.03.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
25.02.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.11.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.11.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.11.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
18.11.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
18.11.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
18.11.2003 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
31.10.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.10.2003 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
13.10.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
06.10.2003 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.10.2003 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 10
02.10.2003 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
02.10.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
18.09.2003 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 22
18.09.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
18.09.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.09.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
18.09.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
18.09.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
18.09.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.09.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.09.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 108
18.09.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
18.09.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 100
18.09.2003 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
21.11.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.10.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.10.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
05.10.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
18.07.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
04.07.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
17.05.2002 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
17.05.2002 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
14.05.2002 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
15.01.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.01.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.01.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 56
29.07.2000 Claims Search / examination 3
29.07.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.06.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.06.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.06.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.02.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.10.1999 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
16.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
16.09.1999 Description Search / examination 4
16.09.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
13.09.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 11
13.07.1999 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.04.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
01.04.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.03.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.12.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.07.1998 Annex Search / examination 3
29.07.1998 Claims Search / examination 3
29.07.1998 Description Search / examination 19
29.07.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.04.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
01.07.1997 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
05.12.1996 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.12.1996 European search report Search / examination 3
13.03.1996 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
13.03.1996 Priority document Search / examination 49
30.01.1996 Extension of time limit granted Search / examination 1
22.01.1996 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 2
14.11.1995 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
25.04.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.04.1995 Claims Search / examination 3
25.04.1995 Description Search / examination 53
25.04.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.04.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7