Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0691404

EP0691404 - Vaccines for the immunisation against TBE-Virusinfections and method for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/02]Improved vaccines for the immunisation against TBE-Virusinfections and method for their preparation
[2000/13]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.11.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 03.04.2002  [2002/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baxter Aktiengesellschaft
Industriestrasse 67
1221 Wien / AT
[1999/44]
Former [1999/38]For all designated states
Baxter Aktiengesellschaft
Industriestrasse 67
1220 Wien / AT
Former [1996/02]For all designated states
IMMUNO Aktiengesellschaft
Industriestrasse 67
A-1221 Wien / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Heinz, Franz Xaver, Prof. Dr.
Josefstädterstrasse 51/1/35
A-1080 Wien / AT
02 / Allison, Steven, Dr.
Klabundgasse 5-7/4/10
A-1190 Wien / AT
03 / Mandl, Christian, Doz. Dr.
Lienfeldergasse 47/41
A-1160 Wien / AT
04 / Kunz, Christian, Prof. Dr.
Naaffgasse 71
A-1180 Wien / AT
[1996/02]
Representative(s)Pawloy, Peter Michael , et al
Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte
Riemergasse 14
1010 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [1996/02]Pawloy, Peter Michael , et al
Patentanwälte Sonn, Pawloy, Weinzinger & Wolfram Riemergasse 14
A-1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date95890132.406.07.1995
[1996/02]
Priority number, dateAT1994000135208.07.1994         Original published format: AT 135294
AT1995000087123.05.1995         Original published format: AT 87195
[1996/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0691404
Date:10.01.1996
Language:DE
[1996/02]
Type: A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication 
No.:EP0691404
Date:13.03.1996
[1996/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0691404
Date:12.11.1997
[1997/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0691404
Date:24.01.2001
Language:DE
[2001/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP24.09.1997
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/40, C07K14/18, A61K39/12, C12N15/85
[1996/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/02]
TitleGerman:Vakzine zur Immunisierung gegen TBE-Virusinfektionen sowie ein Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[2000/13]
English:Vaccines for the immunisation against TBE-Virusinfections and method for their preparation[2000/13]
French:Vaccins pour l'immunisation contre l'encéphalite virale de la tique (TBE-virus) et méthode de fabrication[2000/13]
Former [1996/02]Verbesserte Vakzine zur Immunisierung gegen TBE-Virusinfektionen sowie ein Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung
Former [1996/02]Improved vaccines for the immunisation against TBE-Virusinfections and method for their preparation
Former [1996/02]Vaccins améliorés pour l'immunisation contre l'encéphalite virale de la tique (TBE-virus) et méthode de fabrication
Examination procedure24.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/04]
29.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.07.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2000Fee for grant paid
29.09.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP98107383.6  / EP0869184
Opposition(s)25.10.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
28.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIE24.01.2001
[2002/14]
Documents cited:Search[DXY]WO9203545  (VIROGENETICS CORP [US]) [DX] 16 * page 8, line 10 - page 9, line 14 * * page 16, line 2 - line 37 * * page 18, line 5 - page 25, line 20 * [Y] 1-15,17-26;
 [DXY]  EIJI KONISHI ET AL., "Mice immunized with a subviral particle containing the Japanese Encephalitis Virus prM/M and E proteins are protected from lethal JEV infection", VIROLOGY, ORLANDO US, (199206), vol. 188, no. 2, pages 714 - 720, XP002026147 [DX] 16 * abstract * * page 715, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 716, column L, paragraph 4 - page 717, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 717, column R, paragraph 2 - page 719, column L, paragraph 2 * [Y] 1-15,17-26

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(92)90526-U
 [Y]  CHRISTIAN W. MANDL ET AL., "Sequence of the structural proteins of Tick-borne encephalitis virus (Western subtype) and comparative analysis with other Flaviviruses", VIROLOGY, ORLANDO US, (1988), vol. 168, pages 197 - 205, XP000602618 [Y] 1-15,17-26 * page 197, column L, paragraph 1 - page 198, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 199, column L, paragraph 2; figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(88)90161-4
 [Y]  GRISTUN, T. S. ET AL, "Nucleotide and deduced amino acid sequence of the envelope gene of the Vasilchenko strain of TBE virus;comparison with other flaviviruses", VIRUS RES. (1993), 27(2), 201-9 CODEN: VIREDF;ISSN: 0168-1702, (1993), XP000618524 [Y] 1-13 * page 208, paragraph L; figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1702(93)90082-X
 [A]  KONISHI, EIJI ET AL, "Proper maturation of the Japanese encephalitis virus envelope glycoprotein requires cosynthesis with the premembrane protein", J. VIROL. (1993), 67(3), 1672-5 CODEN: JOVIAM;ISSN: 0022-538X, (1993), XP000618522 [A] 1-26 * the whole document *
 [A]  HOLZMANN H ET AL, "MOLECULAR EPIDEMIOLOGY OF TICK - BORNE ENCEPHALITIS VIRUS CROSS-PROTECTION BETWEEN EUROPEAN AND FAR EASTERN SUBTYPES.", VACCINE 10 (5). 1992. 345-349. CODEN: VACCDE ISSN: 0264-410X, XP002026148 [A] 1,3,16,18 * page 345, column R, paragraph 3 - page 346, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 347, column R, paragraph 4 - page 348, column R, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0264-410X(92)90376-U
 [PDX]  ALLISON, STEVEN L. ET AL, "Expression of cloned envelope protein genes from the flavivirus tick - borne encephalitis virus in mammalian cells and random mutagenesis by PCR", VIRUS GENES (1994), 8(3), 187-98 CODEN: VIGEET;ISSN: 0920-8569, (1994), XP000618523 [PDX] 1-26 * abstract * * page 191, column L, paragraph 1 - column R, paragraph 3 * * page 193, column R, paragraph 2 - page 197, column R, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01703077
Examination   JULIANE SCHALICH ET AL., "Recombinant subviral particles from Tick-Borne Encephalitis Virus are fusogenic and provide a model system for studying Flavivirus envelope glycoprotein functions.", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (19960701), vol. 70, no. 7, pages 4549 - 4557, XP009145918
    THOMAS J. CHAMBERS ET AL.:"Flavivirus genome organization, expression, and replication", ANNUAL REVIEW OF MICROBIOLOGY, 1990, Band 44, Seiten 649-688,
by applicantWO9203545
 WO9203161
 WO9317706
    WHO: Euro Reports and Studies, page 104,
    FIELDS B.N., VIROLOGY, RAVEN PRESS NEW YORK, (1990), pages 763 - 814,
    HEINZ, ROEHRIG, HEINZ, ROEHRIG, REGENMORTEL UND NEURATH (HRSGB.), Immunochemistry of Viruses II. The Basis for Seradiagnosis and Vaccines, AMSTERDAM, ELSEVIER SCIENCES, pages 289 - 305,
    MANDL ET AL., VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 564 - 571,
    KUNZ ET AL., J. MED. VIROL., (1980), vol. 6, pages 103 - 109,
    KUNZ, CH.ACTA LEIDENSIA, (1992), vol. 60, no. 2, pages 1 - 14,
    HEINZ UND MANDL, APMIS, (1994), vol. 101, pages 735 - 745,
    ALLISON ET AL., Gemeinsame Jahrestagung OEBG-OEGGGT, page 114,
    KONISHI ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1992), vol. 188, pages 714 - 720,
    NATURE, (1992), vol. 356, pages 152 - 154,
    RAZ ET AL., PNAS, (1994), vol. 91, pages 9519 - 9523,
    DAVIS ET AL., VACCINE, (1994), vol. 12, no. 16, pages 1503 - 1509,
    CHAMBERS ET AL., "Flavivirus Genome Organization, Expression and Replication", ANNUAL REVIEW OF MICROBIOLOGY, (1990), vol. 44, doi:doi:10.1146/annurev.mi.44.100190.003245, pages 649 - 688, XP008034574

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.mi.44.100190.003245
    "Research News: Naked DNA Points Way to Vaccines", SCIENCE, (19930319), vol. 259, pages 1691 - 1692,
    ALLISON ET AL., VIRUS-GENES, (1994), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 187 - 198,
    MACGREGOR G.R., CASKEY C.T., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, page 2365,
    MANDL C.W., HEINZ F.X., KUNZ C., VIROLOGY, (1988), vol. 166, pages 197 - 205,
    MANDL C.W., VIROLOGY, vol. 173,
    KOZAK M., CELL, (1986), vol. 44, pages 283 - 292,
    KOZAK M., J. MOL BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 947 - 950,
    SAIKI R.K., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 487 - 491,
    MACGREGOR G.R., CASKEY C.T., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1989), vol. 17, page 2365,
    GLUZMAN Y., CELL, (1981), vol. 23, pages 175 - 182,
    MANDL C.W., HEINZ F.X., KUZNZ C., VIROLOGY, (1988), vol. 166, pages 197 - 205,
    DUNNING A.M., TALMUD P., HUMPHRIES S.E., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, page 10393,
    CHEN J. ET AL., MUTAT RES., (1991), vol. 249, pages 169 - 176,
    CADWELL R.C., JOYCE G.F., PCR METHODS APPLIC., (1992), vol. 2, pages 28 - 33,
    MANDL C.W., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 564 - 571,
    FELGNER P.L., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 7413 - 7417,
    HEINZ ET AL., J. BIOL. STAND., (1986), vol. 14, pages 133 - 141,
    RUSSEL ET AL., "Chemical and antigenic structure of flaviviruses", RUSSEL ET AL., SCHLESINGER R.W., The Togaviruses, ACADEMIC PRESS, pages 503 - 529,
    CLARKE, CASALS, AVER. J. TROP. MED. HYG., (1958), vol. 7, pages 561 - 573,
    S. SUBRAMANIE ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1981), vol. 1, pages 854 - 864,
    SOM. CELL. MOL. GET., (1986), vol. 12, pages 555 - 666,
    MANDL ET AL., J. VIROL., (1989), vol. 63, pages 564 - 571,
    HEINZ ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1994), vol. 198, pages 109 - 117,
    CLARKE, CASALS, AMER. J. TROP. MED. HYG., (1958), vol. 7, pages 561 - 573,
    MAC GREGOR ET AL., "Construction of plasmids that express E. coli B-galactosidase in mammalian cells", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1989), vol. 17, no. 6, page 2365, XP000032246
    MANIATIS ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR, N.Y., COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY,