Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0680950

EP0680950 - PROPENONE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/45]PROPENONE DERIVATIVE
[2000/14]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD.
Ohtemachi Bldg., 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD.
Ohtemachi Bldg., 6-1, Ohtemachi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
Former [1995/45]For all designated states
KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO CO., LTD.
Ohtemachi Bldg., 6-1, Ohtemachi I-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / IKEDA, Shun-ichi
11-26, Takasago-cho Numazu-shi
Shizuoka 410 / JP
02 / KIMURA, Uichiro
1188, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-cho
Sunto-gun, Shizuoka 411 / JP
03 / ASHIZAWA, Tadashi
3236-13, Ohoka Numazu-shi
Shizuoka 410 / JP
04 / GOMI, Katsushige
541-12, Izu-shimada Susono-shi
Shizuoka 410-11 / JP
05 / SAITO, Hiromitsu
4-16-19, Nishiikuta Tama-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 214 / JP
06 / KASAI, Masaji
3-12-15, Kugenuma-matsugaoka Fujisawa-shi
Kanagawa 251 / JP
[1995/45]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1995/45]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
D-81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date95900905.116.11.1994
[1995/45]
WO1994JP01934
Priority number, dateJP1993028809117.11.1993         Original published format: JP 28809193
[1995/45]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9514003
Date:26.05.1995
Language:EN
[1995/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0680950
Date:08.11.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1995
[1995/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0680950
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP26.05.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.01.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07D209/12, C07D209/30, C07D401/06, A61K31/40, A61K31/44, C07D405/06
[1996/08]
Former International [1995/45]C07D209/12, C07D209/30, C07D401/06, A61K31/40, A61K31/44
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/45]
TitleGerman:PROPENON-DERIVATE[1995/45]
English:PROPENONE DERIVATIVES[2000/14]
French:DERIVES DE PROPENONE[2000/14]
Former [1995/45]PROPENONE DERIVATIVE
Former [1995/45]DERIVE DE PROPENONE
Entry into regional phase16.08.1995Translation filed 
16.08.1995National basic fee paid 
16.08.1995Search fee paid 
16.08.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.11.1995Examination requested  [1996/01]
13.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
06.11.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
14.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2001Fee for grant paid
14.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
GR23.05.2001
NL23.05.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
IE16.11.2001
LU16.11.2001
MC16.11.2001
[2004/42]
Former [2004/39]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
GR23.05.2001
NL23.05.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
LU16.11.2001
MC16.11.2001
Former [2004/07]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
GR23.05.2001
NL23.05.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
MC16.11.2001
Former [2003/45]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
NL23.05.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
MC16.11.2001
Former [2003/08]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
NL23.05.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
MC16.11.2001
Former [2002/43]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
MC16.11.2001
Former [2002/26]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/14]AT23.05.2001
BE23.05.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/12]BE23.05.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/05]SE23.08.2001
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JPH05507072  ;
 [A]US5196446  (LEVITZKI ALEXANDER [US], et al);
 [A]FR2230349  (DELALANDE SA [FR])
 [A]  - Farmaco, Ed. Sci., 26(7), 591-6 (1971).,
 [A]  - Zh. Prik. Spektrosk., 31(6), 1036-41 (1979).,
 [A]  - Khim. Geterotsikl. Soedin., 1974(4), 519-24.,
 [A]  - Khim.-Farm. Zh., 23(2), 201-6 (1989).,