Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0680663

EP0680663 - METHOD OF MOUNTING A PIEZOELECTRIC ELEMENT TO A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CTS Corporation
905 West Boulevard North
Elkhart, IN 46514 / US
[1999/50]
Former [1995/45]For all designated states
MOTOROLA, INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KNECHT, Thomas, A.
1804 Edgewood
Algonquin, IL 60102 / US
[1995/45]
Representative(s)Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried , et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Former [1995/45]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Motorola, European Intellectual Property, Midpoint, Alencon Link
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Application number, filing date95901014.121.10.1994
[1995/45]
WO1994US12032
Priority number, dateUS1993015776924.11.1993         Original published format: US 157769
[1995/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9515013
Date:01.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0680663
Date:08.11.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.1995
[1995/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0680663
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.06.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:H01L41/18
[1995/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/45]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM MONTIEREN EINES PIEZOELEKTRISCHES ELEMENT AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT[1995/45]
English:METHOD OF MOUNTING A PIEZOELECTRIC ELEMENT TO A SUBSTRATE[1995/45]
French:PROCEDE DE MONTAGE D'UN ELEMENT PIEZO-ELECTRIQUE SUR UN SUBSTRAT[1995/45]
Entry into regional phase24.08.1995National basic fee paid 
24.08.1995Search fee paid 
24.08.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.1995Examination requested  [1996/05]
10.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.10.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
11.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.1999Fee for grant paid
29.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Request for further processing for:07.01.1999Request for further processing filed
07.01.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.02.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
02.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
ES12.01.2000
GR12.01.2000
IT12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
DK12.04.2000
PT12.04.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2004/07]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
ES12.01.2000
GR12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
DK12.04.2000
PT12.04.2000
Former [2003/45]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
ES12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
DK12.04.2000
PT12.04.2000
Former [2003/08]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
ES12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
Former [2002/26]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
ES12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
Former [2001/09]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
PT12.04.2000
Former [2001/08]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS62207008
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880225), vol. 012, no. 063, Database accession no. (E - 585), [X] 1,5,10 * abstract *
International search[Y]US4757581  (YAMADA SUMIO [JP], et al);
 [Y]JPS5256882  (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD);
 [Y]US4666547  (SNOWDEN JR THOMAS M [US], et al);
 [Y]US4703218  (TAKAHASHI HIROYUKI [JP], et al);
 [Y]US4750246  (POLLARD GARY B [US]);
 [Y]US5250870  (FENLON PAUL F [US], et al)