Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0730800

EP0730800 - PROCESS AND CIRCUIT FOR DISTRIBUTING INFORMATION ON BROADCAST PROGRAMMES, PREFERABLY IN WIDEBAND AUTOMATIC TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PEITZ GmbH
Neubeuerner Strasse 10
80686 München / DE
[2000/28]
Former [1996/37]For all designated states
PEITZ GmbH
Neubeuerner Strasse 10
D-80686 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / PEITZ, Albert
Neubeuerner Strasse 10
D-80686 München / DE
[1996/37]
Representative(s)Dosterschill, Peter
Patentanwalt
Fichtenstrasse 11
85570 Ottenhofen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/15]Dosterschill, Peter, Dr.
Fichtenstrasse 11 A
85570 Ottenhofen / DE
Former [1996/37]Dosterschill, Peter, Dr. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg- Frohwitter-Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date95901422.623.11.1994
[1996/37]
WO1994EP03879
Priority number, dateDE1993434007624.11.1993         Original published format: DE 4340076
[1996/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9515040
Date:01.06.1995
Language:DE
[1995/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0730800
Date:11.09.1996
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.1995
[1996/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0730800
Date:12.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.06.1995
ClassificationInternational:H04H1/02
[1996/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1996/37]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR VERTEILUNG VON SENDEPROGRAMMINFORMATIONEN, VORZUGSWEISE IN BREITBAND-FERNMELDEWÄHLNETZEN[1996/37]
English:PROCESS AND CIRCUIT FOR DISTRIBUTING INFORMATION ON BROADCAST PROGRAMMES, PREFERABLY IN WIDEBAND AUTOMATIC TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORKS[1996/37]
French:PROCEDE ET CIRCUIT PERMETTANT DE DIFFUSER DES INFORMATIONS SUR DES PROGRAMMES EMIS, DE PREFERENCE SUR DES RESEAUX AUTOMATIQUES DE TELECOMMUNICATION A LARGE BANDE[1996/37]
Entry into regional phase24.06.1996National basic fee paid 
24.06.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/37]
14.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2000Fee for grant paid
14.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
03.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR12.07.2000
GB12.07.2000
AT23.11.2000
CH30.11.2000
LI30.11.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2002/15]GB12.07.2000
AT23.11.2000
CH30.11.2000
LI30.11.2000
FR08.12.2000
Former [2002/13]GB12.07.2000
CH30.11.2000
LI30.11.2000
FR08.12.2000
Former [2001/24]GB12.07.2000
FR08.12.2000
Former [2001/17]GB12.07.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]US4302771  (GARGINI ERIC J) [A] 1,6 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 24; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]GB2167629  (VISIONHIRE CABLE LIMITED) [A] 1,6 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 37; figure 1; claims 1,5 *;
 [A]EP0333466  (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [A] 1,6 * page 2, column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 7; figures 1,2; claims 1-3,7 * * page 3, column 3, line 26 - line 64 *;
 [A]EP0094794  (COMMUNICATIONS PATENTS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,6 * page 4, line 2 - page 7, line 12; figure 1; claim 1 *