Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0729580

EP0729580 - METHOD OF IDENTIFYING HDM-2-SPECIFIC ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts
Im Neuenheimer Feld 280
69120 Heidelberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/36]For all designated states
Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts
Im Neuenheimer Feld 280
69120 Heidelberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ZENTGRAF, Hanswalter
Bluntschlistrasse 6
D-69155 Heidelberg / DE
02 / KLEIN, Ralf
Alemannenstrasse 26
D-68259 Mannheim / DE
03 / FREY, Manfred
Alemannenstrasse 45
D-68259 Mannheim / DE
04 / MARTENS, Regina
Lessingstrasse 12
D-68799 Reilingen / DE
[1996/36]
Representative(s)Schüssler, Andrea
Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler
Truderinger Strasse 246
81825 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Schüssler, Andrea, Dr.
Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246
81825 München / DE
Former [1996/36]Schüssler, Andrea
Müller-Boré & Partner, Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date95902774.918.11.1994
[1996/36]
WO1994EP03823
Priority number, dateDE1993433953319.11.1993         Original published format: DE 4339533
[1996/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9514233
Date:26.05.1995
[1995/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0729580
Date:04.09.1996
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1995
[1996/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0729580
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search reportEP15.06.1995
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/574, G01N33/543, C07K14/47, C12N15/12
[1996/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/36]
TitleGerman:NACHWEISVERFAHREN FÜR HDM-2-SPEZIFISCHE ANTIKÖRPER[1996/36]
English:METHOD OF IDENTIFYING HDM-2-SPECIFIC ANTIBODIES[1996/36]
French:PROCEDE D'IDENTIFICATION D'ANTICORPS SPECIFIQUES CONTRE L'HDM-2[1996/36]
Entry into regional phase19.06.1996National basic fee paid 
19.06.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/36]
10.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.1998Date of oral proceedings
07.12.1998Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.1999Fee for grant paid
01.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.199603   M06   Fee paid on   09.01.1997
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES02.02.2000
IT02.02.2000
NL02.02.2000
DK02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2003/45]ES02.02.2000
NL02.02.2000
DK02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2003/08]ES02.02.2000
NL02.02.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2002/26]ES02.02.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2001/09]SE02.05.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9320238  (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [A]  - OLSON, DAVID C. ET AL, "Identification and characterization of multiple mdm - proteins and mdm - 2 -p53 protein complexes", ONCOGENE (1993), 8(9), 2353-60 CODEN: ONCNES;ISSN: 0950-9232, (1993), [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - J.D. OLINER, K.W. KINZLER, P.S. MELTZER, D.L. GEORGE & B. VOGELSTEIN, "Amplification of a gene encoding a p53-associated protein in human sarcomas", NATURE., LONDON GB, (19920702), vol. 358, pages 80 - 83, [DA] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ANDERSON J J ET AL, "Production and characterisation of monoclonal antibodies for use in immunohistochemical studies of the homologue of the rine double minute 2 gene product ( MDM2", 168TH MEETING OF THE PATHOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND, LONDON, ENGLAND, UK, JANUARY 5-7, 1994. JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY 172 (SUPPL.). 1994. 135A. ISSN: 0022-3417, [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
Examination   - Clinical Biochemistry 25, 1992, 445 - 449
    - Methods in Enzymology 70, 1980, Hg. H. van Vunakis & J. Langone, pp. 419, 420, 434 - 438