blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0733216 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0733216



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 57
21.11.2000 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.12.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.07.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
12.04.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
12.04.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 40
30.03.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
14.08.1996 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.07.1996 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.07.1995 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3