blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0733216


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.07.2008 Change - representative published on  20.08.2008  [2008/34]
17.11.2000 No opposition filed within time limit published on  03.01.2001 [2001/01]
03.12.1999 (Expected) grant published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
29.11.1999 Renewal fee
24.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant
29.06.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.04.1999 Communication of intention to grant
09.04.1999 First examination report
07.04.1999 Communication of intention to grant
25.02.1999 Amendment by applicant
27.11.1998 Renewal fee
26.11.1997 Renewal fee
28.11.1996 Renewal fee
09.08.1996 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.09.1996 [1996/39]
09.08.1996 Request for examination filed published on  25.09.1996 [1996/39]
06.07.1996 PCT data prior to European publication
22.06.1996 PCT data prior to European publication