blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0733216
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JPH09511055Global Dossier 04.11.1997A
Priority number Date
GB9402676 07.12.1994
GB9325364 10.12.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0733216Global Dossier 19.01.2000B1
EP0733216 25.09.1996A1
Priority number Date
GB9402676 07.12.1994
GB9325364 10.12.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69422729D 24.02.2000D1
Priority number Date
GB9402676 07.12.1994
GB9325364 10.12.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69422729T 21.06.2000T2
Priority number Date
GB9402676 07.12.1994
GB9325364 10.12.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR960706643 09.12.1996A
Priority number Date
GB9402676 07.12.1994
GB9325364 10.12.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2139555 10.10.1999C1
Priority number Date
GB9402676 07.12.1994
GB9325364 10.12.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5712166 27.01.1998A
Priority number Date
GB9402676 07.12.1994
GB9325364 10.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9516210Global Dossier 15.06.1995A1
Priority number Date
GB9325364 10.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2141918T 01.04.2000T3
Priority number Date
GB9325364 10.12.1993
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB9325364D 16.02.1994D0
Priority number Date
GB9325364 10.12.1993