Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0733216

EP0733216 - A METHOD AND MATERIAL FOR THE DETECTION OF IONISING RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
British Nuclear Fuels PLC
Risley Warrington
Cheshire WA3 6AS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/39]For all designated states
British Nuclear Fuels PLC
Risley Warrington Cheshire, WA3 6AS / GB
Inventor(s)01 / BROAN, Christopher, John
100A Beech Street South reston
Lancashire PR1 8JQ / GB
[1996/39]
Representative(s)Goddard, David John , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote LLP
4th Floor, Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Goddard, David John , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote Orlando House 11C Compstall Road Marple Bridge Stockport
SK6 5HH / GB
Former [1996/39]Goddard, David John , et al
HARRISON GODDARD FOOTE 1 Cottage Road
Leeds LS6 4DD / GB
Application number, filing date95903402.607.12.1994
[1996/39]
WO1994GB02676
Priority number, dateGB1993002536410.12.1993         Original published format: GB 9325364
[1996/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9516210
Date:15.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0733216
Date:25.09.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.1995
[1996/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0733216
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.06.1995
ClassificationInternational:G01T1/203, G01T1/04
[1996/39]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/39]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND MATERIAL ZUR ERKENNUNG VON IONISIERENDER STRAHLUNG[1996/39]
English:A METHOD AND MATERIAL FOR THE DETECTION OF IONISING RADIATION[1996/39]
French:PROCEDES ET MATERIAUX UTILISES POUR LA DETECTION D'UNE RADIATION IONISANTE[1996/39]
Entry into regional phase15.06.1996National basic fee paid 
15.06.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/39]
20.02.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
21.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
02.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.1999Fee for grant paid
14.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
17.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
18.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
17.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0255479  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-8,10-19,22 * page 2, line 21 - page 6, line 12 * * page 6, line 47 - line 56 *;
 [AP]EP0583475  (SII TECHNORESEARCH INC [JP], et al) [AP] 1-8,10-19,22 * abstract * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 29 * * page 31, line 35 - line 56 *;
 [A]US2985593  (EDWARD BRODERICK, et al) [A] 1-3,10-16 * see the entire document *;
 [A]US4594179  (HARRAH LARRY A [US], et al) [A] 1-3,9-13 * column A * * column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 45 * * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 14 *