Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0738633

EP0738633 - OPERATION JUDGEMENT SYSTEM FOR AN OCCUPANT PROTECTION DEVICE FOR A FRONT PASSENGER SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Autoliv Japan Ltd.
15-13, Shin Yokohama 2-chome, Kohoku-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP
[1998/38]
Former [1996/43]For all designated states
SENSOR TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.
5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi
Hyogo 651-22 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKEDA, Masaru, Kobe Tech. Center, Sensor Tech.
Co., Ltd. Kobe Seiko 5-th Bldg, 5-5, Takatsukadai
1-chome, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-22 / JP
02 / ONO, Mitsuru, Kobe Tech. Center, Sensor Tech. Co.
Ltd. Kobe Seiko 5-th Bldg 5-5, Takatsukadai
1-chome, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-22 / JP
03 / IMANISHI, Etsujiro, Kobe Tech.Cent. Sensor Tech.
Co., Ltd. Kobe Seiko 5-th Bldg 5-5, Takatsukadai
1-chome, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-22 / JP
04 / TSUJI, Yasushi, Kobe Tech. Center, Sensor Tech.
Co., Ltd., Kobe Seiko 5-th Bldg 5-5, Takatsukadai
1-chome, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-22 / JP
[1996/43]
Representative(s)Pellmann, Hans-Bernd , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/38]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Former [1996/43]Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date95903982.727.12.1994
[1996/43]
WO1994JP02243
Priority number, dateJP1993035252929.12.1993         Original published format: JP 35252993
[1996/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9518028
Date:06.07.1995
Language:EN
[1995/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0738633
Date:23.10.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.1995
[1996/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0738633
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.07.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:B60R21/32, B60R22/46
[1996/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1996/43]
TitleGerman:ENTSCHEIDUNGSSYSTEM ZUR AUSLÖSUNG EINES INSASSENSCHUTZSYSTEMS FÜR EINEN VORDERSITZ[1996/43]
English:OPERATION JUDGEMENT SYSTEM FOR AN OCCUPANT PROTECTION DEVICE FOR A FRONT PASSENGER SEAT[1996/43]
French:SYSTEME EVALUANT LA NECESSITE D'ACTIONNER UN DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION DE PASSAGER DESTINE A UN SIEGE AVANT[1996/43]
Entry into regional phase28.06.1996Translation filed 
28.06.1996National basic fee paid 
28.06.1996Search fee paid 
28.06.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
28.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/43]
15.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.01.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.08.2002Fee for grant paid
28.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
22.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
28.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR06.11.2002
IT06.11.2002
SE06.02.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]FR06.11.2002
SE06.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE06.02.2003
Documents cited:Search[XAY]DE4005598  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 17 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 1 * * figure 2; claims 2-5 * [A] 28 [Y] 33;
 [XAY]DE3802159  (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [X] 26 * column 2, line 60 - column 4, line 27; figure 1 * [A] 28,33,34 [Y] 27,36,37;
 [XAY]EP0473324  (AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LAB [US]) [X] 26 * column 3, lines 10-19; figure 1 * * column 5, lines 1-46 * [A] 17,29,31,32 [Y] 36,37;
 [YA]EP0357225  (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 36,37 * column 7, lines 10-48 * * column 12, lines 13-24 * [A] 28,33;
 [Y]DE4112579  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 33 * column 5, lines 38-40; figure 1; claim 6 *;
 [PXY]WO9422693  (AUTOMOTIVE TECH INT [US]) [PX] 17,18 * page 19, line 6 - page 20, line 3 * * page 22, lines 4-10 * [Y] 27;
 [PXA]DE4341500  (TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS [US]) [PX] 17,26,36 * column 7, line 20 - column 11, line 27; figures 1,2 * [A] 28,29,31,32
International search[X]JPH05270351
 [X]JPH03109963U
 [Y]JPH02147357U
 [Y]JPH01125755U
 [Y]JPH04342639
 [Y]JPH05170047
 [Y]JPH03279051
 [Y]JPH05246300
 [Y]JPH0238164
 [P]JPH06206514