Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0731922

EP0731922 - A RADAR NETWORK FOR SCANNING THE SKY IN A WEATHER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/38]WIDE-ANGLE MULTIPLE-DOPPLER RADAR NETWORK
[1999/26]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2001
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2001 [2001/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wurman, Joshua Michael Aaron Ryder
Apartment 1-2, 3001 Oak Street
Norman, OK 73072 / US
[1996/38]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1996/38]
Representative(s)Hanna, Peter William Derek , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[N/P]
Former [1996/38]Hanna, Peter William Derek , et al
Tomkins & Co., 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date95904179.930.11.1994
[1996/38]
WO1994US13722
Priority number, dateUS1993015939330.11.1993         Original published format: US 159393
[1996/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9515501
Date:08.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0731922
Date:18.09.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.1995
[1996/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0731922
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.06.1995
ClassificationInternational:G01S13/00, G01S13/95
[1996/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/38]
TitleGerman:RADARNETZ ZUR HIMMELABTASTUNG IN EINEM WETTERSYSTEM[1999/26]
English:A RADAR NETWORK FOR SCANNING THE SKY IN A WEATHER SYSTEM[1999/26]
French:RESEAU RADAR POUR LE BALAYAGE DU CIEL DANS UN SYSTEM METEOROLOGIQUE[1999/26]
Former [1996/38]BREITWINKEL - MEHRDOPPLERRADARNETZ
Former [1996/38]WIDE-ANGLE MULTIPLE-DOPPLER RADAR NETWORK
Former [1996/38]RESEAU RADAR DOPPLER MULTIPOSTE ET A LARGE COUVERTURE ANGULAIRE
Entry into regional phase15.06.1996National basic fee paid 
15.06.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/38]
03.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.1999Fee for grant paid
21.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[Y]FR2658617  (DELAHAYE JEAN YVES [FR], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 19; figure - *;
 [A]US5097269  (TAKAYAMA NAOHISA [JP], et al) [A] 12 * figure 3 *;
 [A]WO9319283  (WEATHERFORD US INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 5, line 7 - page 8, line 18; figure - *;
 [A]GB2249685  (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 4 - page 10; figure - *
 [YA]  - PELL, "Multi-static radar for long range air defense", MICROWAVE JOURNAL, DEDHAM US, (19860101), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 171 - 181 [Y] 1-7 * page 172 * * page 174; figure 1 * * page 176 * * page 178; figure 4 * [A] 8-12
 [A]  - DUNSMORE, "Bistatic Radars", ALTA FREQUENZA, MILANO IT, (19890301), vol. 58, no. 2, pages 5 - 31, XP000030392 [A] 8-11 * page 58, paragraph 4 - page 11, paragraph 5 * * page 62, paragraph 6 - page 63, paragraph 7 *