blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0734426

EP0734426 - LOW VISCOSITY HOT MELT PRESSURE SENSITIVE ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  16.11.2007
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc.
5200 Bayway Drive
Baytown, TX 77520 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc.
5200 Bayway Drive
Baytown, TX 77522 / US
Former [1996/40]For all designated states
EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC.
5200 Bayway Drive
Baytown, TX 77522 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JACOB, Lutz, Erich
Lijsterlaan 17
B-3080 Tervuren / BE
[1996/40]
Representative(s)Bawden, Peter Charles, et al
Bawden & Associates
Rothamsted Enterprises
Russell Building
West Common
Harpenden, Hertfordshire AL5 2JQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/45]Bawden, Peter Charles, et al
Bawden & Associates, 4 The Gatehouse 2 High Street
Harpenden, Hertfordshire AL5 2TH / GB
Former [1997/43]Dew, Melvyn John, et al
Exxon Chemical Europe Inc. P.O.Box 105
1830 Machelen / BE
Former [1996/40]Bawden, Peter Charles, et al
EXXON CHEMICAL LIMITED Exxon Chemical Technology Centre PO Box 1
Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
Application number, filing date95905377.813.12.1994
[1996/40]
WO1994US14384
Priority number, dateUS1993016754515.12.1993         Original published format: US 167545
US1994034510328.11.1994         Original published format: US 345103
[1996/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9516755
Date:22.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0734426
Date:02.10.1996
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1996/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0734426
Date:02.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.06.1995
ClassificationIPC:C09J153/02, C09J157/02
[1996/40]
CPC:
C09J153/02 (EP); C08L2666/02 (EP); C08L2666/04 (EP)
C-Set:
C09J153/02, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C09J153/02, C08L2666/04 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/40]
TitleGerman:DRUCKEMPFINDLICHE SCHMELZKLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN NIEDRIGER VISKOSITÄT[1998/36]
English:LOW VISCOSITY HOT MELT PRESSURE SENSITIVE ADHESIVE COMPOSITIONS[1996/40]
French:COMPOSITION ADHESIVE AUTOCOLLANTE A FAIBLE VISCOSITE A L'ETAT FONDU[1996/40]
Former [1996/40]DRUCKEMPFINDLICHE SCHMELZKLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN
Entry into regional phase18.06.1996National basic fee paid 
18.06.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/40]
21.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.03.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.05.1998Fee for grant paid
29.05.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.06.1999  07.06.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services
Postbus 384
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Opponent's representative
Kortekaas, Marcel C.J.A., et al, et al
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C)
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
 02  02.06.1999  15.06.1999  ADMISSIBLE
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
2501 Hudson Road
St. Paul MN 55144-1000 / US
Opponent's representative
Aleandri-Hachgenei, Lorraine E., et al, et al
3M Deutschland GmbH
Office of Intellectual Property Counsel
Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1
41453 Neuss / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/31]
Opponent(s)01  02.06.1999  07.06.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services
Postbus 384
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Opponent's representative
Kortekaas, Marcel C.J.A., et al, et al
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. Postbus 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
 02  02.06.1999  15.06.1999  ADMISSIBLE
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center 2501 Hudson Road
St. Paul MN 55144-1000 / US
Opponent's representative
Aleandri-Hachgenei, Lorraine E., et al, et al
3M Deutschland GmbH, Office of Intellectual Property Counsel, Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1
41453 Neuss / DE
Former [2007/30]
Opponent(s)01  02.06.1999  07.06.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services
Postbus 384
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Opponent's representative
Kortekaas, Marcel C.J.A., et al, et al
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. Postbus 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
 02  02.06.1999  15.06.1999  ADMISSIBLE
3M Innovative Properties Company
2501 Hudson Road
St. Paul, Minnesota 55 144 - 1000 / US
Opponent's representative
Aleandri-Hachgenei, Lorraine E., et al, et al
3M Deutschland GmbH, Office of Intellectual Property Counsel, Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1
41453 Neuss / DE
Former [2002/20]
Opponent(s)01  02.06.1999  07.06.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services
Postbus 384
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Opponent's representative
Kortekaas, Marcellinus C. J. A., et al, et al
KRATON Polymers Research B.V. P.O. Box 384
2501 CJ Den Haag / NL
 02  02.06.1999  15.06.1999  ADMISSIBLE
3M Innovative Properties Company
2501 Hudson Road
St. Paul, Minnesota 55 144 - 1000 / US
Opponent's representative
Aleandri-Hachgenei, Lorraine E., et al, et al
3M Deutschland GmbH, Office of Intellectual Property Counsel, Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1
41453 Neuss / DE
Former [2001/32]
Opponent(s)01  02.06.1999  07.06.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services
Postbus 384
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Opponent's representative
Kortekaas, Marcellinus C. J. A., et al, et al
KRATON Polymers Research B.V. P.O. Box 384
2501 CJ Den Haag / NL
 02  02.06.1999  15.06.1999  ADMISSIBLE
3M Innovative Properties Company
2501 Hudson Road
St. Paul, Minnesota 55 144 - 1000 / US
Opponent's representative
Wilhelm, Stefan
3M Laboratories (Europe) GmbH Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Hansastrasse 9
41453 Neuss / DE
Former [1999/30]
Opponent(s)01  02.06.1999  07.06.1999  ADMISSIBLE
Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services
Postbus 384
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
 02  02.06.1999  15.06.1999  ADMISSIBLE
3M Innovative Properties Company
2501 Hudson Road
St. Paul, Minnesota 55 144 - 1000 / US
Opponent's representative
Wilhelm, Stefan
3M Laboratories (Europe) GmbH Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Hansastrasse 9
41453 Neuss / DE
11.08.1999Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.02.2000Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
05.06.2001Reply to a communication from the opposition division
04.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2002Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2003Reply to a communication from the opposition division
09.12.2004Date of oral proceedings
20.01.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.01.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
26.06.2007Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/51]
Appeal following opposition02.03.2005Appeal received No.  T0295/05
13.05.2005Statement of grounds filed
26.06.2007Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
26.06.2007Date of oral proceedings
02.07.2007Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0318217  (EXXON CHEM. PAT. INC.) [X] 1-14 * page 14, column I, lines 22-45 *;
 [X]WO9317079  (MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUF. CO.) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.