Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0736009

EP0736009 - N-OXIDES OF 4-ARYLPIPERAZINES AND 4-ARYLPIPERIDINES AS ANTIPSYCHOTIC DRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.09.2003  [2003/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ORTHO PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION
U.S. Route no. 202
Raritan, NJ 08869 / US
[1996/41]
Inventor(s)01 / REITZ, Allen, B.
109 Greenbriar Road
Lansdale, PA 19446 / US
02 / McDONNELL, Mark, E.
1280 Sumneytown Pike
Lansdale, PA 19446 / US
[1996/41]
Representative(s)Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/41]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date95906100.322.12.1994
[1996/41]
WO1994US14850
Priority number, dateUS1993017338223.12.1993         Original published format: US 173382
[1996/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9517385
Date:29.06.1995
Language:EN
[1995/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0736009
Date:09.10.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.1995
[1996/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0736009
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.06.1995
ClassificationInternational:C07D211/94, C07D295/22, A61K31/445
[1996/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/41]
Extension statesSI18.07.1996
TitleGerman:N-OXIDE VON 4-ARYLPIPERAZINEN UND 4-ARYLPIPERIDINEN ALS ANTIPSYCHOTISCHE MEDIKAMENTE[1996/41]
English:N-OXIDES OF 4-ARYLPIPERAZINES AND 4-ARYLPIPERIDINES AS ANTIPSYCHOTIC DRUGS[1996/41]
French:N-OXYDES DE 4-ARYLEPIPERAZINES ET 4-ARYLPIPERIDINES UTILISES COMME MEDICAMENTS NEUROLEPTIQUES[1996/41]
Entry into regional phase18.07.1996National basic fee paid 
18.07.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.07.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/41]
23.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.06.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
31.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2002Fee for grant paid
15.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Request for further processing for:31.08.2000Request for further processing filed
31.08.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.09.2000Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[DY]WO9304682  (MCNEILAB INC [US]) [DY] 1-36 * the whole document *;
 [PA]FR2697251  (SYNTHELABO [FR]) [PA] 1-36 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - GORROD, FANG, "On the metabolism of haloperidol", XENOBIOTICA, (1993), vol. 23, no. 5, pages 495 - 508, [Y] 1-36 * page 102, line 4 - line 7 *