Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0688259

EP0688259 - TOOL HANDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FACOM
Société par Actions Simplifiée 6 et 8, rue Gustave Eiffel
91423 Morangis / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
FACOM, Société dite:
6 et 8 Rue Gustave Eiffel
91423 Morangis Cédex / FR
Former [1995/52]For all designated states
FACOM, Société dite:
6 et 8 Rue Gustave Eiffel
F-91423 Morangis Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / GOMAS, Hervé
10 rue de l'Orée des Champs
F-77310 St-Fargeau Ponthierry / FR
[2000/15]
Former [1995/52]01 / GOMAS, Hervé
17, rue Maurice-Ravel
F-91000 Evry / FR
Representative(s)Jacobson, Claude , et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1995/52]Jacobson, Claude , et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date95906360.303.01.1995
[1995/52]
WO1995FR00003
Priority number, dateFR1994000021711.01.1994         Original published format: FR 9400217
[1995/52]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9518701
Date:13.07.1995
Language:FR
[1995/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0688259
Date:27.12.1995
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.1995
[1995/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0688259
Date:12.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.07.1995
ClassificationInternational:B25G1/10
[1995/52]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1995/52]
TitleGerman:WERKZEUGHEFT[1995/52]
English:TOOL HANDLE[1995/52]
French:MANCHE D'OUTIL[1995/52]
Entry into regional phase27.07.1995National basic fee paid 
27.07.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
27.07.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.07.1995Examination requested  [1995/52]
07.08.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.1999Fee for grant paid
12.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
21.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4452289  (SMITH LLOYD T [US]) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, lines 19-28; figure 4 *;
 [Y]US5107590  (BUROUT III CHARLES J [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, lines 6-10 * * column 2, lines 56-61 * * column 3, lines 1-5 * * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 6; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0513459  (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 48 - page 4, line 6 * * page 5, lines 45-46; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE9202550U  (FELO-WERKZEUGFABRIK HOLLAND-LETZ GMBH) [A] 1 * figure 2; claim 14 *;
 [A]WO9206308  ;
 [A]FR2636557  (DEVILLE SA [FR]) [A] 6,7 * page 6, lines 7-18; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE9112630U  (PLIER);
 [A]US2871899  (COYLE JOHN H, et al);
 [A]WO9325354  (WERNER HERMANN WERA WERKE [DE], et al)
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 18, Database accession no. 92-150970, & WO9206308 A 00000000 (POLYPLASTICS KK) [A] 1 * abstract *
Examination EP0635337
  US2985209