Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0740668

EP0740668 - TETRACYCLIC DERIVATIVES, PROCESS OF PREPARATION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.06.1999
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ICOS CORPORATION
22021 20th Avenue, S.E.
Bothell, WA 98021 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/51]For all designated states
ICOS CORPORATION
22021 20th Avenue, S.E.
Bothell, WA 98201 / US
Former [1996/45]For all designated states
LABORATORIES GLAXO WELLCOME S.A.
43, rue Vineuse
75116 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / DAUGAN, Alain Claude-Marie, Laboratoires Glaxo SA.
Centre de Recherches, Z.A. de Courtaboeuf
25, avenue de Québec, F-91940 Les Ulis / FR
[1996/45]
Representative(s)Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [1997/51]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Former [1996/45]Filler, Wendy Anne, Dr. , et al
Glaxo Wellcome plc Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue
Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB
Application number, filing date95907565.619.01.1995
[1996/45]
WO1995EP00183
Priority number, dateGB1994000109021.01.1994         Original published format: GB 9401090
[1996/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9519978
Date:27.07.1995
Language:EN
[1995/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0740668
Date:06.11.1996
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.1995
[1996/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0740668
Date:29.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.07.1995
ClassificationInternational:C07D471/14, A61K31/395, C07D471/04, C07D209/14, // (C07D471/14, 241:00, 221:00, 209:00)
[1996/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/45]
Extension statesLT02.07.1996
SI02.07.1996
TitleGerman:TETRACYCLISCHE DERIVATE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[1996/45]
English:TETRACYCLIC DERIVATIVES, PROCESS OF PREPARATION AND USE[1996/45]
French:DERIVES TETRACYCLIQUES, LEURS PROCEDES DE PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION[1996/45]
Entry into regional phase02.07.1996National basic fee paid 
02.07.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/45]
14.11.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.01.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
15.01.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
21.01.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.04.1998Fee for grant paid
20.04.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.04.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US3917599  (SAXENA ANIL KUMAR, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 1-30 - column 9, lines 1-40 *
 [A]  - SAXENA ET AL., "Agents Acting on the Central Nervous System.15. 2_Substituted 1,2,3,4,6,7,12,12a-octahydropyrazino[2',1':6,1]pyrido[3,4-b]indoles. A New Class of Central Nervous System Depressants", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 16, no. 5, pages 560 - 564, [A] 1 * page 561, column 1 *
 [A]  - ISHIDA; NAKAMURA; IRIE; OHISHI, "A New Method for the preparation of 3,4-Dihydro- and 1,2,3,4-Tetrahydro-beta-carbolines", CHEM. PHARM. BULL., vol. 33, no. 8, pages 3237 - 3249, [A] 17 * page 3237 *
Examination   - CHEM. PHARM. BULL., vol. 33,no. 8, 1985 pages 3237-3249, ISHIDA; NAKAMURA;
    - IRIE; OHISHI 'A New Method for the preparation of 3,4-Dihydro- and 1,2,3,4- Tetrahydro-beta-carbolines'