Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0688443

EP0688443 - Multi-domain color filter substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1995/52]METHOD OF FABRICATING MULTI-DOMAIN, LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAYS
[2001/48]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONEYWELL INC.
Honeywell Plaza
Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/52]For all designated states
HONEYWELL INC.
Honeywell Plaza
Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MC CARTNEY, Richard, I.
5638 East Helena Drive
Scottsdale, AZ 85254 / US
[1995/52]
Representative(s)Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2001/51]Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2001/22]Sturm, Christoph , et al
Honeywell Holding AG, IP Europe Law Dept., Kaiserleistrasse 39
63067 Offenbach am Main / DE
Former [1995/52]Herzbach, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Honeywell Holding AG, Patent- und Lizenzabteilung, Kaiserleistrasse 39
D-63067 Offenbach am Main / DE
Application number, filing date95909249.506.01.1995
[1995/52]
WO1995US00590
Priority number, dateUS1994017871510.01.1994         Original published format: US 178715
[1995/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9518989
Date:13.07.1995
[1995/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0688443
Date:27.12.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.1995
[1995/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0688443
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.09.1995
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/1337
[1995/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/52]
TitleGerman:Multidomänen-Farbfiltersubstrat[2002/01]
English:Multi-domain color filter substrate[2002/01]
French:Substrat de filtres colorés à domaines multiples[2002/01]
Former [1995/52]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MULTIDOMÄN-FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEN
Former [1995/52]METHOD OF FABRICATING MULTI-DOMAIN, LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAYS
Former [1995/52]PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'AFFICHAGES A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES A DOMAINES MULTIPLES
Entry into regional phase08.09.1995National basic fee paid 
08.09.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.1995Examination requested  [1995/52]
30.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2002Fee for grant paid
18.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
31.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0525478  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 27 *;
 [X]EP0525477  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 1 * page 2, line 12 - line 24 *
 [A]  - W.M. GIBSON ET AL.:, "Surface-mediated alignment of nematic liquid crystals with polarized laser light", NATURE, LONDON GB, vol. 351, pages 49 - 50, [A] 1,2 * see the whole article *
Examination EP0189214